Derby Capital, LLC et al v. Trinity HR Services, LLC et al

Defendant: General Employment Enterprises, Inc., U. S. Securities and Exchange Commission, Leed HR, LLC, Judson Bayard Wagenseller, Tiffany Simmons, Trinity HR Services, LLC, Trinity HR, LLC, Brandon Simmons and Michael K. Schoering
Plaintiff: Derby Capital, LLC and Derby Capital JOB, LLC
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00850
Filed: December 21, 2012
 
Court: Kentucky Western District Court
Office: Louisville Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Thomas B. Russell
 
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 13, 2013 40 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER granting 30 Motion to Dismiss, Securities & Exchange Commission is dismissed as a defendant. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 5/10/2013. cc:counsel (KJA)
May 24, 2013 42 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER granting 29 Motion to Dismiss Count X of complaint for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 5/23/2013. cc:counsel (KJA)
June 7, 2013 43 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER granting in part and denying in part 31 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 28 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 6/6/2013. cc:counsel (KJA)
August 20, 2013 58 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER denying 46 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 8/20/2013. cc:counsel (KJA)
August 20, 2013 59 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER granting 47 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 8/20/2013. cc:counsel (KJA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Derby Capital, LLC et al v. Trinity HR Services, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Employment Enterprises, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U. S. Securities and Exchange Commission
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leed HR, LLC
Represented By: Joshua Taylor Rose
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judson Bayard Wagenseller
Represented By: Judson B. Wagenseller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Simmons
Represented By: Judson B. Wagenseller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity HR Services, LLC
Represented By: Judson B. Wagenseller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity HR, LLC
Represented By: Judson B. Wagenseller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Simmons
Represented By: Judson B. Wagenseller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael K. Schoering
Represented By: Joshua Taylor Rose
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derby Capital, LLC
Represented By: Norma C. Miller
Represented By: J. Bruce Miller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derby Capital JOB, LLC
Represented By: J. Bruce Miller
Represented By: Norma C. Miller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]