Fox et al v. Lovas et al

Counter_claimant: Steven W. Hibner and Leslie A. Hibner
Defendant: Louis J. Lovas, Larry J. McManus, Matthew D. Partain, Steven W. Hibner, Leslie A. Hibner, Kelly S. Hutchins, Stephen F. Lovas and Industrial Maintenance & Gears, Inc.
Counter_defendant: Sandra Kay Bottoms and Cindy L. Fox
Plaintiff: Cindy L. Fox and Sandra Kay Bottoms
Case Number: 5:2010cv00219
Filed: December 22, 2010
Court: Kentucky Western District Court
Office: Paducah Office
County: McCracken
Presiding Judge: Thomas B. Russell
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 23, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER denying [] Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting in part and denying in part 7 Motion to Remand. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas B. Russell on 3/23/2011. cc:counsel (KJA)
March 2, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER granting 26 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Telephone Conference set for 4/12/2012 at 9:00 AM before Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 3/1/2012. cc:counsel (KJA)
May 1, 2012 47 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 5/1/2012; re MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Industrial Maintenance & Gears, Inc., 30 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Cindy L. Fox, Sandra Kay Bottoms ; an appropriate order shall issuecc:counsel (KJA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fox et al v. Lovas et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Steven W. Hibner
Represented By: Jackie Madison Matheny, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Leslie A. Hibner
Represented By: Jackie Madison Matheny, Jr.
Represented By: Jackie Madison Matheny, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis J. Lovas
Represented By: James B. Brien, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry J. McManus
Represented By: James B. Brien, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew D. Partain
Represented By: James B. Brien, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven W. Hibner
Represented By: Jackie Madison Matheny, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie A. Hibner
Represented By: Jackie Madison Matheny, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly S. Hutchins
Represented By: James B. Brien, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen F. Lovas
Represented By: James B. Brien, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Maintenance & Gears, Inc.
Represented By: Alan C. Stout
Represented By: Leo Lansden King
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Sandra Kay Bottoms
Represented By: Rick A. Johnson
Represented By: Rick A. Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Cindy L. Fox
Represented By: Rick A. Johnson
Represented By: Rick A. Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy L. Fox
Represented By: Rick A. Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Kay Bottoms
Represented By: Rick A. Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]