Henry v. USA, et al

 
Case Number: 2:2002cv00968
Filed: April 1, 2002
 
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: New Orleans Office
Presiding Judge: Kurt D Engelhardt
Referring Judge: Sally Shushan
 
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422 IRS: Refund Taxes
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 29, 2010 381 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and REASONS - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's motions for recusal (Rec. Docs. 325, 331, 337, 338 and 349) are DENIED. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion (Rec. Doc. 340) is DENIED. Having carefully considered several of Plaintiff 9;s numerous motions for sanctions, IT IS ORDERED that the motions bearing record document numbers 316, 321, 324, 326, 335, and 338 are DENIED. IT IS ORDERED that the motion (Rec. Doc. 317) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's "Praecipe" requesting the issuance of a writ of execution on the April 30, 2007 judgment (Rec. Doc. 319) is DENIED as stated within document. Signed by Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 3/29/2010. (cab)
June 21, 2010 395 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and REASONS denying 366 Motion for New Trial on the Basis Issue; denying 345 and 347 Motions Regarding "Carryback" Claims ; denying Motion ; denying 348 Motion ; denying 350 Motion for Sanctions; denying 342 , 348 , 371 and 373 Motions Demanding Judicial Notice; denying 350 , 351 , 353 and 357 Motions for Sanctions; denying 358 , 364 , 374 , 378 and 380 Motions to Enforce Judgment and for Sanctions; denying 382 Motion for Reconsideration on Res Judi cata Issues; granting 389 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion for Reconsideration on Res Judicata; denying 359 Motion for Subpoena and Evidentiary Hearing; denying 386 Motion seeking Judicial Notice and granting 365 Motion for Leave to File a Reply Memorandum as stated within document. Signed by Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 6/21/2010. (cab)
December 22, 2010 407 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and REASONS - Presently before the Court are several additional motions filed by Plaintiff. Having carefully considered the motions, and any Governmentresponse thereto, the Court rules as stated within document. 390 Motion for Production of Records Pursuant to 26 USC 6203 and 6303 is denied ; 398 Motion to Compel Payment of Judgment Based on Newly Discovered Evidence that the IRS Failed to Comply with 26 USC 6303 and Create or Deliver a Demand for Payment is denied; 402 Motion for L eave to File Response to Government's Answer is granted; 404 Motion for Sanctions is denied; 405 Motion to Compel is denied; 406 Motion to Compel Payment of this Courts Judgment Based on the 7th Circuits Ruling that the Tax Court did not h ave Jurisdiction to Review the Governments attempt to Administratively offset and collect the tax is granted in part and denied in part; 400 Motion for Clarification that the Court has either instructed Henry to File False Tax Returns for 2006, 200 7, 2008, 2009 and 2010 or that the Court has determined that Plaintiff is no longer responsible for filing any Tax returns at any time in the future is denied and 403 Motion for Declaratory Judgment and for Court Ordered Determination is denied. I T IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall not file any additional motions in this action without first seeking leave of court to do so and certifying, in writing, that the proposed submission is not repetitive or duplicative and does not contain any inappropriate, irrelevant, malicious, frivolous, and/or insulting comments. Failure to comply with this order may result in filings being stricken from the record and/or the imposition of significant financial and/or other sanctions, including, but not limited to, payment of excess costs, expenses, and any attorney's fees reasonably incurred by the Government because of Plaintiff's unreasonable and vexatious conduct. Signed by Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 12/21/2010. (cab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Henry v. USA, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]