Core Funding Group, L.P. v. McIntire et al

Plaintiff: Core Funding Group, L.P.
Defendant: Michael H. McIntire, McIntire and McIntire , LLC, Henry T Dart and Henry Dart, Attorneys at Law
 
Case Number: 2:2007cv04273
Filed: August 22, 2007
 
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Out of State
Referring Judge: Alma L. Chasez
Presiding Judge: Ivan L. R. Lemelle
 
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 19, 2011 117 Featured Case ORDER AND REASONS granting 99 Motion for Summary Judgment and denying 100 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 1/18/2011. (caa, )
May 11, 2011 190 Featured Case ORDER & REASONS granting in part and denying in part 144 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 160 Motion for Summary Judgment; dismissing 167 Motion to Sever. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. (lag, )
May 12, 2011 191 Featured Case ORDER & REASONS: Before the Court are Plaintiff's Jury Trial Demand (Rec. Doc. No. 182 ) and Plaintiff's Motion for Trial by Jury (Rec. Doc. No. 181 ), both of which are opposed by Defendants (Rec. Doc. Nos. 184 , 185 ). For the following reasons, IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Jury Trial Demand is untimely, and Plaintiff's Motion for Trial by Jury is DENIED. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 5/11/11. (sek, )
January 5, 2010 64 Featured Case ORDER denying 33 , 21 Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ivan L. R. Lemelle on 1/4/2010. (lag, )
March 11, 2010 70 Featured Case ORDER re 57 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (subject matter jurisdiction) filed by Michael H. McIntire, McIntire and McIntire, LLC, that plaintiff file an appropriate amendment within 14 days after this order, or the case will be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 3/10/2010.(lag, )
March 26, 2010 74 Featured Case ORDER denying 65 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 3/24/2010. (lag, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Core Funding Group, L.P. v. McIntire et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Core Funding Group, L.P.
Represented By: Alan Dean Weinberger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael H. McIntire
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McIntire and McIntire , LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry T Dart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Dart, Attorneys at Law
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]