In Re: Dorothy Chase Stewart

Appellant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Appellee: Dorothy Chase Stewart
Trustee: US Trustee
 
Case Number: 2:2008cv03225
Filed: May 12, 2008
 
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: Bankruptcy Appeal (801) Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Sarah S. Vance
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BAP)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 11, 2010 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS re: 75 Motion for Attorney Fees. ORDERED that the Application for an Award of Fees and Costs is DENIED. Signed by Judge Helen G. Berrigan on 1/11/10. (Reference: 08-3225)(plh, )
June 10, 2009 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that appellant's 37 Motion to Stay the Mandatory Audit Injunction Contained in the Bankruptcy Court Judgment Pending Appeal is DENIED. Signed by Judge Helen G. Berrigan on 6/5/09. (Reference: 08-3225)(plh, )
August 7, 2009 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS that Wells Fargo's appeal is RENDERED MOOT. Signed by Judge Helen G. Berrigan on 8/7/09.(Reference: 08-4805)(plh, )
August 7, 2009 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS. The Judgments of the Bankruptcy Court are AFFIRMED. Wells Fargo's appeals in civil action number 08-3225, 08-3669, 08-3852, and 08-3853 are DENIED. Signed by Judge Helen G. Berrigan on 8/7/2009.(Reference: 08-3255, 08-3669, 08-3852, 08-3853)(mmm, ) Modified document type on 8/10/2009 (plh, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: In Re: Dorothy Chase Stewart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Hilary B. Bonial
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Dorothy Chase Stewart
Represented By: Kirk L. Myers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: US Trustee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]