Conwill v. Greenberg Traurig, L.L.P. et al

Plaintiff: Daniel O. Conwill, IV
Defendant: Greenberg Traurig, L.L.P., Jay I Gordon and John B Ohle, III
Case Number: 2:2009cv04365
Filed: July 9, 2009
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Sally Shushan
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 13, 2010 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 66 Motion to Set Aside Default, Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk. (car, )
July 29, 2010 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 35 Motion for Summary Judgment and 33 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk. (car, )
January 13, 2011 286 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS denying 267 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 1/12/2011. (caa, )
February 7, 2011 319 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 310 MOTION for APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court; finding as moot 315 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk. (car, )
March 10, 2011 324 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 318 MOTION for APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk. (car, )
March 22, 2011 328 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and REASONS re 235 239 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment are GRANTED. Plaintiffs RICO claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and plaintiffs remaining state law claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk. (cms, )
December 22, 2009 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 14 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk. (car, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conwill v. Greenberg Traurig, L.L.P. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel O. Conwill, IV
Represented By: Lynn E. Swanson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenberg Traurig, L.L.P.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay I Gordon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John B Ohle, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]