In Re: Phoenix Associates Land Syndicate, Inc.

Plaintiff: Wilbur J Babin, Jr
Defendant: Caddo East Estates I, Ltd., Jet Transfer, L.L.C., Preston Turbines, L.L.C., Grayson Aviation I, L.L.C., CEE Transfer, L.L.C., Lake Texoma Jet Center, L.L.C. and Red River Turbines, L.L.C.
Trustee: Wilbur J Babin, Jr and US Trustee
Case Number: 2:2010cv00896
Filed: March 18, 2010
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: New Orleans Office
Presiding Judge: Helen G. Berrigan
Referring Judge: Sally Shushan
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 13, 2012 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 69 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan. (gec, )
August 9, 2013 167 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS denying 133 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 8/9/13. (plh, )
August 9, 2013 168 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS denying 136 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 8/9/13. (plh, )
July 24, 2014 196 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS granting 173 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 179 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The Court grants the Plaintiff leave to file a fifth amended complaint by August 15, 2014 asserting a cause of action for br each of fiduciary duty only under Texas law. Schuler and Caddo are given leave to file a motion to dismiss in response to the Plaintiff's fifth amended complaint by September 1, 2014, for a submission date on September 24, 2014. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn)
October 28, 2014 213 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS denying 198 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Phoenix Associates Land Syndicate, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilbur J Babin, Jr
Represented By: Alicia Martone Bendana
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caddo East Estates I, Ltd.
Represented By: J. David Forsyth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jet Transfer, L.L.C.
Represented By: J. David Forsyth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preston Turbines, L.L.C.
Represented By: J. David Forsyth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grayson Aviation I, L.L.C.
Represented By: J. David Forsyth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEE Transfer, L.L.C.
Represented By: J. David Forsyth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake Texoma Jet Center, L.L.C.
Represented By: J. David Forsyth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red River Turbines, L.L.C.
Represented By: J. David Forsyth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Wilbur J Babin, Jr
Represented By: Alicia Martone Bendana
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: US Trustee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]