In re Gulf States Long Term Acute Care of Covington, L.L.C.

Defendant: Breazeale, Sachse & Wilson, L.L.P. and Gregory D. Frost
Plaintiff: David V. Adler
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv01659
Filed: July 15, 2011
 
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Alma L. Chasez
 
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 5, 2012 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS granting 98 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting 120 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Party Gulf States Healthcare Properties of Dallas, LLC, Gulf States Meadows, LP, Jamestown Gaming, LLC, Jamestown, Inc., New Braunfels Healthcare Properties, LLC, Breazeale, Sachse & Wilson, L.L.P. and Gregory D. Frost dismissed. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (ecm, )
November 15, 2013 435 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 433 Motion to Vacate; Motion to Reinstate Motion for Summary Judgment. Intervening Defendants are not precluded from filing a properly supported motion for summary judgment or judgment on the pleadings. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that to the extent this Order is inconsistent with the Court's previous Order (R.Doc.403), the latter is modified accordingly. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (Reference: 11-1659)(ecm, )
January 9, 2014 482 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS denying Sodexo Operations, L.L.C.'s 481 Request for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. Plaintiff in Intervention, Sodexo Operations, LLC, may not file any further amended pleadings. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 1/8/14.(Reference: 11-1659)(ecm, ) Modified document type on 1/9/2014 (ecm, ).
January 27, 2014 494 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS regarding 487 MOTION for APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court. The Magistrate Judge's ruling on Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Third Amended Complaint (R. Doc. 447) is AFFIRMED. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (Reference: 11-1659)(ecm, )
February 4, 2014 498 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS denying 359 Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Appellants have standing to appeal the challenged bankruptcy order. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 2/3/14. (Reference: 13-508)(ecm, )
April 7, 2014 554 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS denying 364 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (Reference: 11-1659)(ecm)
April 21, 2014 566 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS granting 426 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff in Intervention Sodexo Operations LLC's claims against Frost & BSW are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 4/21/2014. (Reference: 11-1659)(my)
May 16, 2014 618 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS re 524 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoenas to BSW/Greg Frost, Including Production for Inspection and Copying of Documents and Electronically Stored Information and Deposition Testimony Called for by Subpoenas filed by Sodexo Operations, L.L.C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North.(Reference: All cases)(lag)
June 23, 2014 658 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS denying 584 Objection to Subpoena Duces Tecum Issued to Regions Bank, Motion to Quash and Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North. (Reference: All cases)(lag)
August 25, 2011 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS granting 1 Motion to Withdraw Reference to Bankruptcy Court. FURTHER ORDERED that the underlying case, Bankruptcy Eastern District of Louisiana Case No. 11-1034, should be transferred to District Court in the Eastern District of Louisiana, and that the case be carried on the docket of this Court under the style and number shown in the caption of this Order and Reasons. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier. (gec, ) (CC:LAEB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: In re Gulf States Long Term Acute Care of Covington, L.L.C.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Breazeale, Sachse & Wilson, L.L.P.
Represented By: Stephen H. Kupperman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory D. Frost
Represented By: Stephen H. Kupperman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David V. Adler
Represented By: Robert Joshua Koch, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]