Glover v. Kansas City Southern Railway Company

Plaintiff: Wesley Shane Glover
Defendant: Kansas City Southern Railway Company
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv02808
Filed: November 11, 2011
 
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Referring Judge: Joseph C. Wilkinson
 
Nature of Suit: Federal Employers Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 2, 2013 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS granting in part, denying in part 53 MOTION to Compel Supplemental Responses to Written Discovery Requests. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 8/2/2013.(blg)
September 20, 2013 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS granting in part and denying in part 25 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Issue of Liability. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 9/20/2013. (my, )
November 4, 2013 151 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS denying 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Kansas City Southern Railway Company, as decided during the October 25, 2013 status conference. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(ecm, ) Modified document type on 11/4/2013 (ecm, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Glover v. Kansas City Southern Railway Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Shane Glover
Represented By: Blake G. Arata, Jr.
Represented By: C. Perrin Rome, III
Represented By: William Chad Stelly
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas City Southern Railway Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]