Coleman et al v. H.C. Price Co. et al

Plaintiff: Levi Coleman, Sr., Barbara Coleman, Shirley Coleman Moreland, Levi Coleman, Jr., Stanley Newton, Greta A. Richardson, Deborah Coleman Divinity, Beverly N. Marshall, Romunda Coleman Redfield, Jermaine Coleman, Allana Keller, Nathalie George, Troy Selmon, Melvin J. Landry, Charles R. Lookhoff, Quebedeaux Bowsley, Timothy B. Kufel, Alfreida Bradley, Earlie M. Bradley, Earl C. Bradley, Jr., Glynn R. Bradley, Lionel Adams, Stephanie LaBove, Imogene Muckleroy, Tara Marie Austin, Ashley Austin, Howard Ray Griffin, Steven Muckleroy, Charlie Muckleroy, Charles J. Walton, Andrew Jackson, Jr., Dominic Buras, Jerry Fontineau, Jr., Leslie Rushing, Daniel Griffin, Anthony Franklin, Joseph A. Walker, Eugene Jackson, Melvin Alexie, Sr., Patrick Bourque, Jimmy Edwards, Glen R. Kirby, Tammy B. Bradley, Dorothy W. Bradley, April A. Bradley, Wyatt B. Bradley, Melvin J. Bradley, Mallere Bradley Edwards, Celeste LeBlanc Pontiff, Mickey Howard Pontiff, Carol Kirby Helser, Gary Kirby, Mary U. Miller, Pierre Miller, Jr., Amanda L Miller, Terry Burge, Theardis Garden, William Leaumont, Thomas Walters, Burnell Jefferson, Milton Vincent, Alcide Labove, Kenneth Soape, Sr., John Smith, Sr, Norbert Gregory, Drew LaBove, Destinee LaBove, Tara LaBove, Desiree LaBove, Tessa LaBove, Barbara Soape, Kenneth Soape, Jr., April Soape, Chursha Soape, Herman Smith, Louis Thomas, Sr., Ruben Davis, Sr., Ricky A. Austin, Terrell Smith, John Smith, Jr., Gary Smith, Gregory Smith, Rhonda McHenry, Vianna Percle, Charlene Smith, Annie Smith, Ashanti Smith, Dexter Smith, Odelia Thomas, Louis Thomas, Jr., TeShilonne Thomas, Benny Davis, Ruben Davis, Jr., Edward Davis, Geraldine Joseph, Patricia McCray, Robert Austin, Scott Muckleroy, Sylvia Gray, Sandra Jackson, Wanda Jackson, Kasi Jackson, Joe Jackson, Mary Ellen Lookhoff, Dolores Quebedeaux, Donovan Quebedeaux, Brent Quebedeaux, Gregory Quebedeaux, Saunder Bradley Edwards Alex and Bertha Ozell Edge Kirby
Defendant: Bredero Price Company, H.C. Price Co., Packard Pipe Terminals, Inc., OFS, Inc., Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America, Inc., Chevron U.S.A., Inc., Exxon Mobil Corporation, Shell Offshore, Inc., Shell Oil Company, SWEPI, LP, Union Oil Company of California, Superior Oil Company, Halliburton Energy Services, Inc, Halliburton Company and KBR, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2011cv02937
Filed: November 29, 2011
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Daniel E. Knowles
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 4, 2013 161 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS denying 138 Motion for Reconsideration, as stated herein. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 1/4/2013. (tsf)
September 5, 2013 287 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 284 . Plaintiffs shall complywith the Report and Recommendation no later than fifteen (15) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 9/4/13.(cbn)
September 2, 2014 435 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file the restated complaint be and hereby is GRANTED. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants' motions to dismiss, to the extent they seek dismissal of Plaintiffs claims for breac h of contract or warranty, absolute liability under Civil Code article 667, and fraud or conspiracy, be and hereby are DENIED AS MOOT. To the extent Defendants' motions seek dismissal of claims by plaintiffs solely because the complaint does not assert specific causes of action against specific Defendants, IT IS ORDERED that Defendants' motions to dismiss be and hereby are DENIED AS MOOT. To the extent Defendants move to dismiss Plaintiffs' tort claims against their employers, IT IS ORDERED that Defendants motions be and hereby are GRANTED. To the extent Defendants move to dismiss Plaintiffs' intentional tort claims against their alleged employers arising after 1976, IT IS ORDERED that Defendants' motions be and her eby are DENIED. To the extent Defendants move to dismiss Plaintiffs' intentional tort claims as being insufficiently pleaded, IT IS ORDERED that Defendants' motions be and hereby are DENIED. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants' motions to di smiss be and hereby are DENIED to the extent Defendants' seek to dismiss Plaintiffs' strict liability claims based on lack of a "defect." To the extent the Defendants' motions to dismiss seek to dismiss claims for punitive da mages arising outside of the 1984-1995 window, IT IS ORDERED that Defendants' motions be and hereby are DENIED AS MOOT. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants' motions be and hereby are GRANTED to the extent any Plaintiff seeks punitive damages in a wrongful death claim. To the extent Defendants' motions seek to dismiss Plaintiffs' survival claims as untimely, IT IS ORDERED that Defendants' motions be and hereby are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. To the extent Tubo-FGS seeks to dismis s Plaintiffs' complaint based on the application of Texas law, IT IS ORDERED that Tubo-FGS's motion be and hereby is DENIED. OFS's motion is DENIED to the extent OFS asks the Court to dismiss the claims against it by the Kirby Plaintiffs and Joseph A. Walker. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn)
April 3, 2012 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS denying 24 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 4/2/2012. (rll, )
April 3, 2012 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: GRANTING IN PART 28 Motion for More Definite Statement; GRANTING IN PART 37 Motion for More Definite Statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 4/3/2012. (mm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman et al v. H.C. Price Co. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levi Coleman, Sr.
Represented By: Kenneth M. Waguespack, Jr.
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Coleman
Represented By: Kenneth M. Waguespack, Jr.
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Coleman Moreland
Represented By: Kenneth M. Waguespack, Jr.
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levi Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Kenneth M. Waguespack, Jr.
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Newton
Represented By: Kenneth M. Waguespack, Jr.
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greta A. Richardson
Represented By: Kenneth M. Waguespack, Jr.
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Coleman Divinity
Represented By: Kenneth M. Waguespack, Jr.
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly N. Marshall
Represented By: Kenneth M. Waguespack, Jr.
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Romunda Coleman Redfield
Represented By: Kenneth M. Waguespack, Jr.
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jermaine Coleman
Represented By: Kenneth M. Waguespack, Jr.
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allana Keller
Represented By: Kenneth M. Waguespack, Jr.
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathalie George
Represented By: Kenneth M. Waguespack, Jr.
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Selmon
Represented By: Kenneth M. Waguespack, Jr.
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin J. Landry
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles R. Lookhoff
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quebedeaux Bowsley
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy B. Kufel
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfreida Bradley
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earlie M. Bradley
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl C. Bradley, Jr.
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glynn R. Bradley
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lionel Adams
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie LaBove
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Imogene Muckleroy
Represented By: John L. Fontenot, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Marie Austin
Represented By: John L. Fontenot, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Austin
Represented By: John L. Fontenot, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Ray Griffin
Represented By: John L. Fontenot, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Muckleroy
Represented By: John L. Fontenot, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlie Muckleroy
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles J. Walton
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Jackson, Jr.
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominic Buras
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Fontineau, Jr.
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Rushing
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Griffin
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Franklin
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph A. Walker
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Jackson
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Alexie, Sr.
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Bourque
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Edwards
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen R. Kirby
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy B. Bradley
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy W. Bradley
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April A. Bradley
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wyatt B. Bradley
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin J. Bradley
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mallere Bradley Edwards
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celeste LeBlanc Pontiff
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mickey Howard Pontiff
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Kirby Helser
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Kirby
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary U. Miller
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pierre Miller, Jr.
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda L Miller
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Burge
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theardis Garden
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Leaumont
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Walters
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Burnell Jefferson
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milton Vincent
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alcide Labove
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Soape, Sr.
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Smith, Sr
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norbert Gregory
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drew LaBove
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Destinee LaBove
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara LaBove
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desiree LaBove
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tessa LaBove
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Soape
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Soape, Jr.
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Soape
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chursha Soape
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herman Smith
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Thomas, Sr.
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Davis, Sr.
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky A. Austin
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrell Smith
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Smith
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Smith
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda McHenry
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vianna Percle
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlene Smith
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie Smith
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashanti Smith
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dexter Smith
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Odelia Thomas
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Thomas, Jr.
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TeShilonne Thomas
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benny Davis
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Davis, Jr.
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Davis
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geraldine Joseph
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia McCray
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Austin
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Muckleroy
Represented By: John L. Fontenot, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Gray
Represented By: John L. Fontenot, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Jackson
Represented By: John L. Fontenot, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Jackson
Represented By: John L. Fontenot, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kasi Jackson
Represented By: John L. Fontenot, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Jackson
Represented By: John L. Fontenot, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Ellen Lookhoff
Represented By: John L. Fontenot, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dolores Quebedeaux
Represented By: John L. Fontenot, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donovan Quebedeaux
Represented By: John L. Fontenot, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Quebedeaux
Represented By: John L. Fontenot, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Quebedeaux
Represented By: John L. Fontenot, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saunder Bradley Edwards Alex
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bertha Ozell Edge Kirby
Represented By: Lloyd Stafford Jolibois, Jr.
Represented By: Robert McMillin
Represented By: Stuart Housel Smith
Represented By: Michael G. Stag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bredero Price Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.C. Price Co.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Packard Pipe Terminals, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFS, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Richfield Company
Represented By: Ronald Adams Johnson
Represented By: Gavin H. Guillot
Represented By: Bettye Anne Barrios
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Products North America, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald Adams Johnson
Represented By: Gavin H. Guillot
Represented By: Bettye Anne Barrios
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Michael Raudon Phillips
Represented By: Louis Matthew Grossman
Represented By: Brittany Buckley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxon Mobil Corporation
Represented By: Roland M. Vandenweghe, Jr.
Represented By: Martin Alan Stern
Represented By: Glen Marion Pilie
Represented By: Valeria M. Sercovich
Represented By: Charles Fenner Gay, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Offshore, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas M. McNamara
Represented By: Chadwick J. Mollere
Represented By: Jill Thompson Losch
Represented By: Mary S. Johnson
Represented By: Nichole M. Gray
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Company
Represented By: Thomas M. McNamara
Represented By: Chadwick J. Mollere
Represented By: Jill Thompson Losch
Represented By: Mary S. Johnson
Represented By: Nichole M. Gray
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SWEPI, LP
Represented By: Thomas M. McNamara
Represented By: Chadwick J. Mollere
Represented By: Jill Thompson Losch
Represented By: Mary S. Johnson
Represented By: Nichole M. Gray
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Oil Company of California
Represented By: Michael Raudon Phillips
Represented By: Louis Matthew Grossman
Represented By: Brittany Buckley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Oil Company
Represented By: Roland M. Vandenweghe, Jr.
Represented By: Martin Alan Stern
Represented By: Valeria M. Sercovich
Represented By: Glen Marion Pilie
Represented By: Charles Fenner Gay, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halliburton Energy Services, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halliburton Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KBR, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]