Boice-Durant v. Kenner Police Dept, et al

Defendant: Thibodaux Police Department, Russel Brand, Kenner Police Dept, Unidentified Party and Orleans Parish Sheriff Department
Plaintiff: Timothy Boice-Durant
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv00603
Filed: March 8, 2012
 
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Out of State
Referring Judge: Alma L. Chasez
Presiding Judge: Susie Morgan
 
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 18, 2014 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 119 Motion to Stay and Motion for Sanctions by Timothy Boice-Durant. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Boice-Durant's request to inform the Court be and hereby is DENIED. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn)
April 15, 2014 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS granting 122 and 135 Motions to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Party Steve Caraway and Marlin N. Gusman dismissed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the issue of frivolousness under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2) shall be referred to United States Magistrate Judge North for Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 4/15/2014. NEF to MJ5. (bwn)
June 12, 2014 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 149 - IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff's suit be dismissed as frivolous, malicious and for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(I) and (ii) as outlined in the Report and Recommendation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the pending motions in this case be dismissed as MOOT. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan.(bwn)
July 6, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 Motion to Dismiss; granting 12 Motion to Dismiss Party. Party Kenner Police Dept and Orleans Parish Sheriff Department dismissed. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 7/5/12. (cbn)
August 7, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that 28 Motion to Dismiss be and hereby is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Boice-Durant's claims against the Thibodaux Police Departments be and hereby are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failure to state a claim upon whichrelief can be granted. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 8/7/2012. (clm, )
March 28, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS denying 36 Motion for Entry of Default and 37 Motion for Default Judgment. FURTHER ORDERED that Boice-Durant shall show good cause, in writing, why his claims against Mr. Brand should not be dismissed, pursuant to Rule 4(m), fo r failure to timely serve his complaint on Mr. Brand. Boice-Durants written response to this show cause order shall be filed no later than May 3, 2013, and the document must be received by this Court by May 3, 2013 to be considered timely.. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 3/28/2013. (gbw, )
March 29, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 38 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and 39 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 3/29/2013. (tsf)
March 29, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS denying 42 Motion for Reconsideration. FURTHER ORDER granting in part 43 Motion for Reconsideration, as to plaintiff filing an amended complaint no later than 5/3/2013 at 5:00 pm, as stated herein. Failure to comply with this deadline will result in the dismissal of the plaintiff's claims against Mr. Brand. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 3/29/2013. (tsf)
June 17, 2013 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 50 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 65 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. FURTHER ORDERED that no later that 8/1/13 pla shall file into the record a return of service demonstrating that service on dft Braud has been perfected under Rule 4(e). Failure to comply with this deadline will result in pla's claims against dft Braud being dismissed under Rule 4(m). Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (cbn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Boice-Durant v. Kenner Police Dept, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thibodaux Police Department
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russel Brand
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenner Police Dept
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Party
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orleans Parish Sheriff Department
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Boice-Durant
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]