Rooster Petroleum, LLC et al v. Fairways Offshore Exploration, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Rooster Petroleum, LLC and Rooster Oil & Gas, LLC
Defendant: Fairways Offshore Exploration, Inc., Bureau of Ocean Energy Management and John L. Rodi
Case Number: 2:2012cv01322
Filed: May 22, 2012
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Eldon E. Fallon
Referring Judge: Sally Shushan
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 4, 2013 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS that Fairways Offshore Explorations, Inc.'s 122 Motion for Summary Judgment and Rooster Petroleum, LLC's and Rooster Oil and Gas, LLC's 124 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment are DENIED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 12/2/13. (dno, )
August 8, 2012 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS that the Plaintiffs' 5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction against Fairways is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction against BOEM and John Rodi is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 8/8/12. (dno, )
October 15, 2012 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS that the Plaintiffs' 38 Motion to Dismiss Fairways' Counterclaim for Failure to State a Claim is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that Fairways be given leave to file an amended counterclaim pursuant to Rule 15(a)(2) withing 30 days of this order. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 10/12/12. (dno, )
October 15, 2012 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS that Plaintiffs' 39 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Defendant Fairways Offshore Exploration, Inc.'s 48 Motion for Summary Judgment are GRANTED IN PART. Specifically, Rooster's motion is GRANTED with res pect to the termination of the PUA and the breach of the PUA by wrongful termination and DENIED with respect to the breach of the PUA by Fairways' objection and causation of damages. Fairways' motion is GRANTED with respect to Rooster's claims for equitable relief and DENIED with respect to the termination of the PUA, the breach of the PUA, and causation of damages. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 10/10/12. (dno, )
February 20, 2013 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS that Defendant Fairways Offshore Exploration, Inc.'s 65 Motion for Reconsideration re 62 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Order on Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART. With respect to the Court� 39;s holding that Fairways breached the contract by wrongful termination, that holding is WITHDRAWN and summary judgment is GRANTED to Fairways. With respect to the Court's holding that the PUA remained in effect following the termination of Fa irways' lease, that holding is AMENDED to state that as a matter of contract interpretation, the expiration of Fairways' lease did not cause the PUA to terminate, but that the Court reserves the issue of whether the PUA actually remained in effect at that time until the resolution of Fairways' claim for breach of the PUA by Rooster. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 2/20/13. (dno, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rooster Petroleum, LLC et al v. Fairways Offshore Exploration, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rooster Petroleum, LLC
Represented By: Paul J. Goodwine
Represented By: Addie Danos Arvidson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rooster Oil & Gas, LLC
Represented By: Addie Danos Arvidson
Represented By: Paul J. Goodwine
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairways Offshore Exploration, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Ocean Energy Management
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John L. Rodi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]