Premier Dealer Services, Inc. v. Duhon et al

Defendant: Toyota of Poway, Scott Nietert, Wayne Skinnard, Premier Automotive Products L.L.C., Premier Nissan of Fremont, Premier Nissan LLC, Premier Nissan of San Jose, LLC, Premier Automotive, L.L.C., Troy Duhon, Premier Quality Imports, L.L.C. and Premier Asian Imports, L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Premier Dealer Services, Inc.
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv01498
Filed: June 12, 2012
 
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 21, 2013 142 Featured Case ORDERED that 133 Motion to Quash Deposition of A. Kurt Wolery is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (clm, )
November 1, 2013 146 Featured Case ORDER AND REASONS denying re 105 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , denying 68 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 11/1/2013.(Reference: All Cases)(mmm)
November 8, 2013 147 Featured Case ORDERED that 100 Motion to Compel is DENIED AS MOOT, DENIED IN PART, and GRANTED IN PART as set forth in document. FURTHER ORDERED that an award of reasonable expenses, including attorneys fees, and reasonable costs necessitated by the filing of this motion, pursuant to Rule 37(a)(5)(A) is awarded against Premier Dealer. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall file a Motion to Fix Attorneys Fees into the record, no later than Wednesday, 12/4/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (clm, )
November 22, 2013 151 Featured Case ORDERED that 101 Motion for Sanctions based on Spoliation of Evidence is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as stated herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (clm, )
July 31, 2013 92 Featured Case ORDER AND REASONS granting in part and denying in part 24 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Counts three, four, five, eight, nine, and eleven are dismissed with prejudice against the Individual Defendants. Count ten is dismissed wi thout prejudice against the Individual Defendants. Counts one, two, six, and seven remain against the Individual Defendants. Plaintiff has fifteen days to amend only Count Ten. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo ON 7/30/2013. (Reference: 12-1498)(ecm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Premier Dealer Services, Inc. v. Duhon et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota of Poway
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Nietert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Skinnard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Automotive Products L.L.C.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Nissan of Fremont
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Nissan LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Nissan of San Jose, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Automotive, L.L.C.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Duhon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Quality Imports, L.L.C.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Asian Imports, L.L.C.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Premier Dealer Services, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Allan Chopin
Represented By: Bradley Joseph Luminais, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]