Namer v. Broadcasting Board of Governors et al

Plaintiff: Robert Namer
Defendant: Broadcasting Board of Governors and Voice of America
Case Number: 2:2012cv02232
Filed: September 7, 2012
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Daniel E. Knowles
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 10, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS granting 11 Motion to Dismiss Counts I, II, and V of the Complaint or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. (ijg, )
May 14, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court Minute Order. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael North: Motion Hearing held on 5/14/2014 re 53 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Voice of America, Broadcasting Board of Governors. (lag)
November 5, 2014 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS granting 66 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. (lag)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Namer v. Broadcasting Board of Governors et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Namer
Represented By: J. Richard Kanuch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broadcasting Board of Governors
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Voice of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]