Cooper v. Bolton et al

Defendant: Christen Hardy, Constellation Investment Consulting Corporation, George Bolton, George Elliman and Westend Capital Management, L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Sean C Cooper
Case Number: 2:2012cv02934
Filed: December 12, 2012
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
Presiding Judge: Kurt D. Engelhardt
Referring Judge: Daniel E. Knowles
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 18, 2014 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and REASONS denying 119 MOTION for APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court, as stated within document. Signed by Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 11/18/2014. (cbs)
August 26, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and REASONS - Presently before the Court are various motions, including one seeking to compel Plaintiff to submit the claims asserted herein to arbitration. See Rec. Docs. 7, 18, 32 and 34. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants' motion to compel a rbitration 7 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion to strike 18 is GRANTED for purposes of the Court's consideration of Defendants' motion. IT IS ORDERED that the motion to strike 34 is GR ANTED for purposes of the Court's consideration of the Defendants' motion to compel arbitration. IT IS ORDERED, on the showing made, that Constellation's motion 32 is GRANTED to the extent that Plaintiff's claims against it are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, if Plaintiff desires to proceed further with his claims against Constellation, he must seek leave, no later than twenty (20) days from the entry of this Order and Reasons, to file an amending and superseding complaint remedying the pleading deficiencies, as stated within document. Signed by Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 8/26/2013. (cbs)
September 25, 2013 69 Opinion or Order of the Court Minute Order. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III: Motion Hearing held on 9/25/2013, granting in part 61 MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by Fowler Rodriguez Valdes-Fauli as set forth in document. (lag, )
December 20, 2013 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and REASONS granting 66 Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice Amended Complaint as to Defendant Constellation Investment Consulting Corporation, as stated within document. Signed by Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 12/20/2013. (cbs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper v. Bolton et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christen Hardy
Represented By: Kristen V. Gresham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Constellation Investment Consulting Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Bolton
Represented By: Kristen V. Gresham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Elliman
Represented By: Kristen V. Gresham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westend Capital Management, L.L.C.
Represented By: Kristen V. Gresham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean C Cooper
Represented By: Kearney S. Loughlin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]