Dasilva v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al

Defendant: Cindy Gomez, Joseph La Rocca, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services and Glenda M. Raborn
Plaintiff: Rafael Ellwanger Dasilva
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00013
Filed: January 4, 2013
 
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Tangipahoa
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Daniel E. Knowles
 
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 19, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that the 22 government's motion to dismiss is GRANTED IN PART. DaSilva's "Mandatory Access Law" and constitutional claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. FURTHER ORDERED that the motion to dismiss is DISMISSED AS MOOT in all other respects. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 4/19/2013. (blg)
April 19, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that the 27 motion for partial summary judgment and the 31 motion for judicial notice are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall submit cross motions for summary judgment on or before 5/1/2013. To the exte nt the parties intend the Court to consider assertions or arguments made in other pleadings, including prior motions or oppositions, the parties should present these assertions or arguments in the May 1 motions. FURTHER ORDERED that these motions shall be taken under advisement on 5/15/2013, without oral argument. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 4/19/2013. (blg)
September 4, 2013 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS re 39 and 41 Motions for Summary Judgment: ORDERED that the motions for summary judgment are DISMISSED AS MOOT relative to the documents referred to ICE. FURTHER ORDERED that USCIS's motion for summary judgment is GRANTE D IN PART and DaSilva's motion for summary judgment is DENIED IN PART. FURTHER ORDERED that the Court DEFERS ruling on the cross motions pending in camera review of documents, as stated herein. USCIS shall provide the Court with an unredact ed copy of these documents no later than Monday, 9/16/2013. FURTHER ORDERED that the Court DEFERS ruling on documents, as stated herein, pending the submission of a supplemental affidavit. USCIS shall submit a supplementary affidavit relative to these documents on or before Monday, 9/16/2013. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 9/4/2013. (blg)
September 19, 2013 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS that USCIS's 41 motion for summary judgment is GRANTED and that DaSilva's 39 motion for summary judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 9/19/2013.(blg)
February 3, 2014 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS denying 73 MOTION for Attorney Fees under the Equal Access to Justice Act filed by Rafael Ellwanger Dasilva. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 2/3/2014.(blg)
February 24, 2014 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS granting in part, denying in part, and dismissing without prejudice in all other respects 70 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs. FURTHER ORDERED that on or before 3/10/2014, plaintiff shall file a separate motion, including a revised time sheet consistent with the directives herein, addressing the proper amount of attorney's fees relative solely to the disclosure of the second set of documents. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 2/24/2014. (blg)
March 28, 2014 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS that objection to ex parte communications is overruled; FURTHER ORDERED that 85 MOTION for Leave to File Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees is granted; FURTHER ORDERED that 83 Second MOTION for Attorney Fees will be taken under advisement without oral argument on 4/3/2014 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 3/27/2014.(lag)
May 7, 2014 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS granting in part and denying in part 83 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 5/7/2014. (blg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Dasilva v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Gomez
Represented By: Brock Darren Dupre
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph La Rocca
Represented By: Brock Darren Dupre
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Brock Darren Dupre
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenda M. Raborn
Represented By: Brock Darren Dupre
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Ellwanger Dasilva
Represented By: Michael Wayne Gahagan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]