Plains Pipeline, L.P. et al v. Great Lakes Dredge & Dock Company et al

Plaintiff: Plains Pipeline, LP and Phillips 66 Pipeline, LLC
Defendant: Great Lakes Dredge & Dock Company, Great Lakes Dredge & Dock Company, LLC of Louisiana, Dawn Services LLC, Texas Dredge, Pacific Dawn Tug and Coastal Dawn Tug
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00398
Filed: March 1, 2013
 
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Out of State
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Presiding Judge: Stanwood R. Duval
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 29, 2014 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS granting 39 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr on 8/29/2014. (my)
September 5, 2014 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS denying 40 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' claims for Statutory Liability under the Louisiana One Call Law (Pl. Compl., paragraph XXI-XXV) are hereby DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr on 9/5/2014. (swd)
September 17, 2014 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS granting 41 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 73 Motion to Strike Declarations of Robert Mehl. Signed by Judge Stanwood R. Duval, Jr on 9/17/2014. (swd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Plains Pipeline, L.P. et al v. Great Lakes Dredge & Dock Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plains Pipeline, LP
Represented By: Norman Charles Sullivan, Jr.
Represented By: W. Jacob Gardner, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillips 66 Pipeline, LLC
Represented By: W. Jacob Gardner, Jr.
Represented By: Norman Charles Sullivan, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Lakes Dredge & Dock Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Lakes Dredge & Dock Company, LLC of Louisiana
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Services LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Dredge
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Dawn Tug
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coastal Dawn Tug
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]