Ainsworth v. Caillou Island Towing Company, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Tracy Ainsworth
Defendant: Caillou Island Towing Company, Inc., Monteiro Fleet, Inc. and Monteiro Marine Services, Inc
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00688
Filed: April 10, 2013
 
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Terrebonne
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Joseph C. Wilkinson
 
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:30104 Marine Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 24, 2013 17 Featured Case ORDER AND REASONS that Defendants' Rule 12(c) Motion for Partial Judgment onthe Pleadings is GRANTED and Plaintiff's request for lost future earnings, loss of society damages, and punitive damages are STRICKEN from the complaint, as they are not recoverable here. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 6/24/2013. (cms, )
October 21, 2013 38 Featured Case ORDER & REASONS: Before the Court is Plaintiff Tracy Ainsworth's ("Plaintiff") "Unopposed Motion for Reconsideration of Defendants' Rule 12(c) Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings" (Rec. Doc. 33). After consideri ng the pending motion, the memorandum in support, the record, and the applicable law, for the reasons stated herein, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that "Unopposed Motion for Reconsideration of Defendants' Rule 12(c) Motion for Partial Judgment on th e Pleadings" (Rec. Doc. 33) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the portion of this Court's June 24, 2013 Order (Rec. Doc. 17) striking Plaintiff's request for punitive damages is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the portions of this Court's June 24, 2013 Order (Rec. Doc. 17) striking Plaintiff's requests for lost future earning and loss of society damages remain unchanged. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 10/21/2013. (rll, )
November 14, 2013 60 Featured Case ORDER & REASONS re dfts Caillou Island Towing Company, Inc., Monteiro Fleet, Inc. and Monteiro Marine Services, Inc.'s 35 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment: as set forth herein, after considering the pending motion, the memoranda in support, the memoranda in opposition, the record, and the applicable law, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 11/13/2013. (rll, )
November 25, 2013 71 Featured Case ORDER AND REASONS denying 34 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 11/25/2013. (cms, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ainsworth v. Caillou Island Towing Company, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Ainsworth
Represented By: Walter K. Naquin, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caillou Island Towing Company, Inc.
Represented By: Harry E. Morse
Represented By: Charles E. Rothermel
Represented By: Kelley A. Sevin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monteiro Fleet, Inc.
Represented By: Harry E. Morse
Represented By: Charles E. Rothermel
Represented By: Kelley A. Sevin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monteiro Marine Services, Inc
Represented By: Harry E. Morse
Represented By: Charles E. Rothermel
Represented By: Kelley A. Sevin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]