Castay v. Ochsner Clinic Foundation

Defendant: Ochsner Clinic Foundation
Plaintiff: Anne Victoria Castay
Case Number: 2:2013cv02492
Filed: April 29, 2013
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
Presiding Judge: Susie Morgan
Referring Judge: Joseph C. Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601 Family Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 8, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS granting in part and denying in part 7 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 1/7/2014. (caa, )
February 4, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS granting Defendant's 24 Second Motion for Summary Judgment. The case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 2/4/14. (tsf)
April 4, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS denying 50 Motion to Alter 49 Judgment. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 4/4/2014. (tsf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castay v. Ochsner Clinic Foundation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ochsner Clinic Foundation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Victoria Castay
Represented By: Dale Edward Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]