Chauvin v. National Gypsum Service Company et al

Defendant: National Gypsum Company, National Gypsum Service Company and New NGC, Inc
Plaintiff: Tony Chauvin
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv05781
Filed: September 9, 2013
 
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Kurt D. Engelhardt
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
 
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 13, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS granting 9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Party New NGC, Inc dismissed. FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff shall have twenty (20) days in which to file an amended complaint. Signed by Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 3/13/2014. (mmm)
June 13, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and REASONS - IT IS ORDERED that Defendant's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment (Rec. Doc. 27) is hereby GRANTED, and the plaintiff's claims are hereby DISMISSED. A motion for reconsideration of this Order, if any, must be filed within ten (10) days of the date this Order is entered by the Clerk of Court, as stated within document. Signed by Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 6/13/2014. (cbs)
July 21, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and REASONS - IT IS ORDERED that: (1) The plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration (Rec. Doc. 32) is GRANTED, and the Court's Order and Reasons of June 13, 2014 (Rec. Doc. 29) is hereby VACATED; Defendant's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion t o Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment (Rec. Doc. 27) is hereby GRANTED IN PART, and DENIED IN PART. The plaintiff's claims under ERISA, 29 U.S.C. 1140, under the Louisiana Whistleblower Protection Statute, La. Rev. Stat. 23:967(A), and for intentional infliction of emotional distress are hereby DISMISSED; and (4) The defendant's Motion to Assess Defense Costs and Attorney Fees (Rec. Doc. 38) is hereby DENIED, as stated within document. Signed by Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 7/21/2014.(cbs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Chauvin v. National Gypsum Service Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Gypsum Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Gypsum Service Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New NGC, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Chauvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]