Doe v. Jindal et al

Defendant: Trent Brignac, James D. Caldwell, Jr., Hillar C. Moore, III, James M. LeBlanc, John Phillip Haney and Bobby Jindal
Plaintiff: James Doe and John Doe
Case Number: 3:2011cv00554
Filed: August 15, 2011
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 16, 2012 50 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION: for reasons stated, the Court concludes that the Act is unconstitutionally overbroad and void for vagueness, and judgment shall issue in favor of Plaintiffs and against Defendants, enjoining enforcement of the Act. IT IS ORDERED that, within ten days of the issuance of this Opinion, the parties shall submit a joint proposed judgment that accords with this Opinion. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 2/16/2012. (PJH)
March 2, 2012 54 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT LSA-R.S. 14:91.5, also known as the Unlawful Use or Access of Social Media Law, is declared unconstitutionally vague and overbroad. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that defendants, James D. Caldwell, Attorney General of Louisia na ; Hillar C. Moore, III, District Attorney for East Baton Rouge Parish; John Phillip Haney, District Attorney for Iberia, SI. Martin, and SI. Mary Parishes; and defendants' officers, agents, servants, employees, attorneys, and other persons wh o are in active concert or participation with the above are permanently enjoined from, directly orindirectly, enforcing LSA-R.S. 14:91.5. James Doe and John Doe are the prevailing parties and the defendants shall pay reasonable attys fees as stated herein. Plaintiffs are awarded costs as provided by law.(PJH)
August 19, 2011 8 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 8/19/2011. (PJH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Jindal et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trent Brignac
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James D. Caldwell, Jr.
Represented By: Bridget Benoit Denicola
Represented By: Emalie Anne Boyce
Represented By: S. Kyle Duncan
Represented By: John W. Sinquefield
Represented By: Uma M. Subramanian
Represented By: Kurt Lawrence Wall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillar C. Moore, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M. LeBlanc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Phillip Haney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Jindal
Represented By: Emalie Anne Boyce
Represented By: S. Kyle Duncan
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Doe
Represented By: Justin Paul Harrison
Represented By: Ronald Lawrence Wilson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Justin Paul Harrison
Represented By: Ronald Lawrence Wilson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]