Radford v. Red Jacket Firearms, LLC et al

Defendant: William Hayden, Red Jacket Firearms, LLC and Red Jacket, Inc.
Plaintiff: Joseph Radford
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv00561
Filed: August 17, 2011
 
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
 
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 20, 2013 71 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting the 65 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Accordingly, the 54 MOTION for Involuntary Dismissal of Plaintiff Ronald Reynolds is granted. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 02/20/2013. (SMG)
July 17, 2013 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: This matter shall not be dismissed and the plaintiffs' state law claims shall be entertained by this Court. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 07/16/2013. (NLT)
September 13, 2013 99 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in part and denying in part 66 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. As previously discussed in the pretrial conference (doc. 96), Plaintiffs have 15 days to file a Motion for Leave to Amend their complaint in order to specifically plead their fraud claim. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 09/13/2013. (CGP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Radford v. Red Jacket Firearms, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Hayden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Jacket Firearms, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Jacket, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Radford
Represented By: Larry E. Demmons
Represented By: Ross Michael Molina
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]