Lewis v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.

Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Brian Lewis
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00747
Filed: November 27, 2012
 
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Referring Judge: Magistrate Judge Unassigned
 
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 31, 2013 101 Featured Case RULING denying with prejudice 95 Motion to Overrule and 96 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court. Signed by District Judge Shelly D. Dick on 10/31/2013. (LLH)
October 31, 2013 102 Featured Case ORDER granting 79 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Shelly D. Dick on 10/31/2013. (LLH)
July 10, 2013 37 Featured Case RULING Adopting 23 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The 2 Motion to Remand is hereby DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 07/10/2013. (CGP)
July 16, 2013 41 Featured Case ORDER denying as futile 33 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint, and denying as moot 33 Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. To the extent that Plaintiff seeks discovery from nonparties, IT IS ORDERED that his Motion is DENIED for his failure t o comply with the subpoena requirements of Rule 45. If Plaintiff wishes to obtain information from a party to the suit, his Motion is DENIED for his failure to comply with the discovery provisions of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Court refers Plaintiff to its discussion of those provisions in its previous Order (R. Doc. 19) denying his Motion to Compel (R. Doc. 5). Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 07/16/2013. (CGP)
July 31, 2013 48 Featured Case RULING: Plaintiffs Motion to Dismiss the Recusal Motions is GRANTED, thereby DENYING his three pending motions to recuse. Plaintiff's Expedited Motion to Request a Master on Case Number 12-747 Under Rule 53 is DENIED. Plaintiff's two expedi ted motions for pre-trial hearings or demand settlement hearings are DENIED. Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Consideration of His Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Rulings on May 9, 2013; June 18, 2013; and July 17, 2013 is hereby GRANT ED in part and DENIED in Part. Plaintiff's motion is GRANTED as to being considered expeditiously; however, the Court AFFIRMS the aforementioned Magistrate Judge's rulings thereby DENYING Plaintiff's request to overrule them. Furthermore, the Court hereby refers Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time on Request About Subpoena to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by District Judge Shelly D. Dick on 07/31/2013. (NLT)
October 30, 2013 94 Featured Case RULING denying 87 Motion to Amend Complaint; denying as moot 87 Motion to Expedite because October 21, 2013 has passed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 10/30/2013. (LLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Lewis v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Robert W. Barton
Represented By: Harry Joseph Philips, Jr.
Represented By: L. Adam Thames
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Lewis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]