Louisiana Health Care Self Insurance Fund v. The United States of America

Plaintiff: Louisiana Health Care Self Insurance Fund
Defendant: The United States of America
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00766
Filed: December 4, 2012
 
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Magistrate Judge Unassigned
 
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422 IRS: Refund Taxes
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 25, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 39 Motion to Strike Rebuttal Report of Defendant's Expert, Edward W. Buttner, IV. The Court advises the parties that any future rebuttal reports will not be permitted from experts, unless under extreme circumstances. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 7/25/2014. (SMG)
September 29, 2014 88 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER: The Court will DEFER ruling on the 45 Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony and Report of Edward W. Buttner, IV until a Daubert hearing is conducted on the first day of trial prior to the selection of a jury. The 70 Motion in L imine to Exclude Evidence is GRANTED, except that the Court will DEFER ruling on the admissibility of the Buttner survey of property and casualty insurers until trial. The Court will GRANT 40 Motion in Limine Regarding Proposed Testimony of Craig L . Pichette in part to the extent that the parties are instructed that neither expert will be permitted to give opinion testimony on legal conclusions, but the Court will DEFER until the time of trial a ruling on whether specific questions call for a legal conclusion. The 69 Motion in Limine Regarding Plaintiffs Proposed Evidence of Administrative Proceedings Before the Internal Revenue Service is GRANTED IN PART and DEFERRED IN PART until a question-by-question determination can be made on the day of trial outside the presence of the jury. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 9/29/2014. (SMG) Modified to edit text on 9/29/2014 (SMG).
October 20, 2014 98 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN REASONS FOR DENIAL OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT: For the reasons stated herein, the Court denies Louisiana Health Care Self Insurance Funds Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (See R.Doc. 44 and 87). Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 10/20/2014. (SMG) Modified to edit document type on 10/20/2014 (SMG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Louisiana Health Care Self Insurance Fund v. The United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisiana Health Care Self Insurance Fund
Represented By: David Robert Kelly
Represented By: Eric Baronet Landry
Represented By: Van R. Mayhall, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]