Wiggins v. Cain et al

Respondent: N. Burl Cain and James Caldwell
Petitioner: Lorenzo C. Wiggins
Case Number: 3:2013cv00198
Filed: March 27, 2013
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 2, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER adopting 15 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge and granting 14 MOTION to Dismiss All Grounds for Relief Which Were Not Fully Exhausted Through the State Courts when Original Habeas Corpus Petition was Filed filed by Lorenzo C. Wiggins. This matter is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 07/01/2014. (CGP)
January 13, 2015 36 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER granting 34 MOTION to Enforce This Court's Previous Order to the Clerk of Court for the 19th Judicial District Court. Within 14 days, the Clerk of Court for the Nineteenth Judicial District Court shall supplement the previous ly filed state court record by filing with this court copies of the two recorded statements played during the evidentiary hearing held on 11/12/2010. If the Clerk of Court is unable to produce either of the recorded statements, he shall advise this court in writing why he is unable to produce the recording.The 35 MOTION to Order Transcription of Recorded Tape Statements is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 1/13/2015. (LLH)
March 18, 2015 41 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER: The Court APPROVES the Magistrate Judge's 31 Report and Recommendation and 39 Supplemental Report and Recommendation and ADOPTS them as the Court's opinion in this matter, in conjunction with the instant Ruling and Or der. The 1 Petition Under 28 U.S.C. § 2254 for a Writ of Habeas Corpus is DENIED. A certificate of appealability is DENIED because Petitioner has failed to make "a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right." 28 U.S.C. § 2253(c)(2). Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 03/18/2015. (BCL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wiggins v. Cain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: N. Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lorenzo C. Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]