Lavergne v. Cain et al

Defendant: N. Burl Cain, Ken Norse, Angie Norwood and Darrell Vannoy
Plaintiff: Brandon Scott Lavergne
Case Number: 3:2013cv00233
Filed: April 11, 2013
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 5, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying without prejudice 6 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 6/5/2013. (LLH)
June 5, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 9 Motion for Removal Order. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 6/5/2013. (LLH)
June 5, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 8 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 6/5/2013. (LLH)
September 5, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 23 MOTION for ReHearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 09/05/2013. (NLT)
May 12, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 50 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 5/12/2014. (LLH)
June 3, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING regarding the 52 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The Plaintiff's 31 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED and the Defendant's 34 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 6/3/2014. (LLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lavergne v. Cain et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Burl Cain
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Norse
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angie Norwood
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell Vannoy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Scott Lavergne
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]