Southwest Louisiana Hospital Association v. BASF Construction Chemicals, LLC

Plaintiff: Southwest Louisiana Hospital Association
Defendant: BASF Construction Chemicals, LLC
Case Number: 2:2010cv00902
Filed: June 7, 2010
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lake Charles Office
County: Calcasieu
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 30, 2014 115 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 69 MOTION in Limine and/or DAUBERT MOTION filed by B A S F Corp. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 5/27/2014. (crt,FinnSld, P)
October 2, 2014 142 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING granting 119 MOTION to Strike 111 Pretrial Memorandum (portions) and to Enforce Previous Rulings filed by Southwest Louisiana Hospital Association. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 9/29/2014. (crt,FinnSld, P)
April 26, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING granting 40 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Southwest Louisiana Hospital Association, and denying 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by B A S F Corp. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 4/25/2013. (crt,FinnSld, P)
April 29, 2013 62 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING granting 40 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Southwest Louisiana Hospital Association, denying 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by B A S F Corp. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 4/29/2013. (crt,FinnSld, P)
September 6, 2013 81 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER GRANTING 63 MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by B A S F Corp, 60 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, and 62 Memorandum Ruling, re: 40 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Southwest Louisiana Hospital Association, 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by B A S F Corp. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 9/6/2013. (crt,FinnSld, P)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southwest Louisiana Hospital Association v. BASF Construction Chemicals, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southwest Louisiana Hospital Association
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Construction Chemicals, LLC
Represented By: Scott C Barney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]