Johnson v. Railroad Controls L P et al

Defendant: T N T Equipment Sales & Rentals Inc, Railroad Controls L P and Burlington Northern & Santa Fe Railway Co
Plaintiff: Chad Johnson and Betty Johnson
Case Number: 2:2011cv01722
Filed: September 26, 2011
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lake Charles Office
County: Allen
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Presiding Judge: Patricia Minaldi
Nature of Suit: Federal Employers Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 7, 2014 118 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING that the 69 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Navistar Inc is DENIED as to the plaintiffs' claim for a construction or composition defect under the LPLA and is GRANTED as to the plaintiffs' cla ims under the LPLA for a design defect; 69 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim 94 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction over subject matter filed by Railroad Controls L P, B N S F Railway Co, 78 MOTION to S tay is DENIED, AS MOOT; 85 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Diversified Metal Fabricators Inc, IS denied as to the plaintiffs' claim for a construction or composition defect under the LPLA and is GRANTED as to the plaintiffs' claim under the LPLA for a design defect; 91 MOTION to Stay is DENIED, AS MOOT; 94 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction over subject matter, is GRANTED and the claims under the FELA Act 45 USC 51-60, i ncluding Mrs. Johnson's claims for loss of consortium under FELA are DISMISSED. The dismissal of the plaintiffs' FELA claims shall have no effect on the plaintiffs' state law claims; 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment with opposition filed by Chad Johnson is DENIED; 107 Motion is DENIED, AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 7/1/2014. (crt,FinnSld, P)
December 17, 2014 210 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING granting 161 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Navistar Inc. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 12/17/2014. (crt,FinnSld, P)
January 22, 2014 88 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING DENYING IN PART and GRANTING IN PART 35 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Railroad Controls L P, B N S F Railway Co; and DENYING IN PART and GRANTING IN PART 36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by T N T Equipment Sales & Rentals Inc. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 1/15/2014. (crt,FinnSld, P)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Railroad Controls L P et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T N T Equipment Sales & Rentals Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Railroad Controls L P
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burlington Northern & Santa Fe Railway Co
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Johnson
Represented By: Cameron N Ehsani Landry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Johnson
Represented By: Cameron N Ehsani Landry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]