Turfgrass Group Inc et al v. Northeast Louisiana Turf Farms L L C et al

Plaintiff: Turfgrass Group Inc and University of Georgia Research Foundation Inc
Defendant: Northeast Louisiana Turf Farms L L C and Jeffrey Clifton Nicolle
 
Case Number: 3:2010cv01354
Filed: August 27, 2010
 
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Monroe Office
County: Morehouse
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Presiding Judge: Robert G James
 
Nature of Suit: Agricultural Acts
Cause of Action: 07:2321
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2014 106 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING granting in part denying in part 89 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by University of Georgia Research Foundation Inc, Turfgrass Group Inc. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 9/30/2014. (crt,FinnSld, P)
September 30, 2014 107 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the 89 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is hereby GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 9/30/2014. (crt,FinnSld, P)
September 26, 2013 65 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jeffrey Clifton Nicolle, Northeast Louisiana Turf Farms L L C. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 09/26/13. (crt,Guillot, M)
October 15, 2013 70 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED MEMORANDUM RULING re 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jeffrey Clifton Nicolle, Northeast Louisiana Turf Farms L L C. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 10/15/13. (crt,Guillot, M)
November 20, 2013 75 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 32 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 11/20/2013. (crt,Yocum, M)
August 25, 2014 93 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING AND ORDER denying 79 Daubert Motion. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 8/25/14. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
August 25, 2014 94 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 80 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jeffrey Clifton Nicolle, Northeast Louisiana Turf Farms L L C. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 8/25/14. (crt,DickersonSld, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Turfgrass Group Inc et al v. Northeast Louisiana Turf Farms L L C et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Turfgrass Group Inc
Represented By: John Scott Sartin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: University of Georgia Research Foundation Inc
Represented By: John Scott Sartin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northeast Louisiana Turf Farms L L C
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Clifton Nicolle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]