Jones et al v. Herlin et al

Plaintiff: James H Jones and Kristi Jones
Defendant: Robert S Herlin, N G S S U B Corp and Evolution Petroleum Corp
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv01978
Filed: July 23, 2012
 
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Monroe Office
County: Ouachita
Presiding Judge: Donald E Walter
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
 
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 6, 2013 14 Featured Case MEMORANDUM RULING re 9 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Robert S Herlin, N G S Sub Corp, Evolution Petroleum Corp. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 3/6/13. (crt,Crawford, A)
September 17, 2013 30 Featured Case MEMORANDUM RULING granting in part and denying in part 20 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff's claims under Louisiana Civil Code articles 1967 and 2315 and Louisiana Revised Statutes section 51:1401 et seq are dismissed with prejudice. Motion denied as to Plaintiff's claims under Louisiana Civil Code articles 1953 and 2029, et seq. Signed by Judge Donald E Walter on September 17, 2013. (crt,Dunford, T)
July 14, 2014 37 Featured Case ORDER: Before the Court is Defendants' 34 Motion for Reconsideration of Defendants' 20 Rule 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss. Specifically, Defendants want the Court to reconsider its previous ruling regarding Plaintiffs' claims of fra ud and contractual nullity. Plaintiffs oppose this motion. Having considered the motion, the opposition, the record, and the applicable law, the Defendants' 34 Motion for Reconsideration is hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge Donald E Walter on 7/11/2014. (crt,Putch, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Jones et al v. Herlin et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James H Jones
Represented By: Donald L Kneipp
Represented By: Brady D King, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristi Jones
Represented By: Brady D King, II
Represented By: Donald L Kneipp
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert S Herlin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N G S S U B Corp
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evolution Petroleum Corp
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]