Brooks v. Kennedy et al

Defendant: Frank G Kennedy Logging and Frank G Kennedy
Plaintiff: Clinton Brooks, Jr
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00326
Filed: February 11, 2013
 
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Monroe Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Presiding Judge: Robert G James
 
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Torts to Land
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 7, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 14 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by Clinton Brooks, Jr. Plaintiff shall provide the court with a current, valid service address for Defendant by 11/4/2013. Plaintiff is cautioned that if he fails to so comply, then his complaint may be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 10/07/2013. (crt,Yocum, M)
March 27, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 26 Report and Recommendation. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Defendant Frank G. Kennedy's 21 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction is GRANTED, and this lawsuit is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's 24 Motion to Declare Plaintiff a Vexatious Litigant is hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 3/27/14. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
April 3, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 8 Amended Complaint filed by Clinton Brooks, Jr. Upon consideration of the foregoing, IT IS ORDERED that defendant, Frank G Kennedy Logging, is hereby STRICKEN from the complaint, as amended. Furthermore, as to the remaining parties, the court finds that plaintiff has made the requisite allegations to establish diversity jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 04/03/13. (crt,Yocum, M) Modified filed date on 4/4/2013 (Yocum, M).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Brooks v. Kennedy et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank G Kennedy Logging
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank G Kennedy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clinton Brooks, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]