Sibley v. Allstate Insurance Co et al

Defendant: Allstate Insurance Co and Liberty Life Assurance Co of Boston
Plaintiff: Robert C Sibley, Jr
Case Number: 3:2013cv01261
Filed: May 28, 2013
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Monroe Office
County: Caddo
Presiding Judge: Donald E Walter
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying as moot 12 Motion to Strike 8 Affimative Defenses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 9/26/13. (crt,Crawford, A)
November 5, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER. Counsel for defendant is directed to deliver a copy of the relevant plan documents and the entire administrative record to counsel for the plaintiff by January 6, 2014. Counsel for the plaintiff should review the record and promptl y advise counsel for the defendant of any contentions that therecord is not complete, so that any such issues may be resolved on a timely basis. The parties are directed to file by March 7, 2014 a joint stipulation of facts setting out any necessary background facts and stipulating to the submission of the case for decision on the administrative record and plandocuments, which are to be submitted along with the stipulation. By April 4, 2013, plaintiff shall file a Motion For Decision on Stipulat ed Record, along with his/her brief on the merits. The defendant's brief is due by May 5, 2014. If necessary, plaintiff may file a reply upon leave of Court. The Clerk is directed to list this matter on the next Motion Day thereafter as submitted to the undersigned for decision on the stipulated record. Signed by Judge Donald E Walter on 11/5/13. (crt,Kennedy, T)
June 10, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER: Counsel for defendant is directed to deliver a copy of the relevant plan document and the entire administrative record to counsel for the plaintiff by 7/7/2014. Counsel for the plaintiff should review the record and promptly advise counsel for the defendant of any contentions that the record is not complete, so that any such issues may be resolved on a timely basis. The parties are directed to file by 9/8/2014 a joint stipulation of facts setting out any necessary background fa cts and stipulating to the submission of the case for decision on the administrative record and plan documents, which are to be submitted along with the stipulation. By 10/10/2014, plaintiff shall file a Motion for Decision on Stipulated Record, along with his/her brief on the merits. The defendant's brief is due by 11/10/2014. If necessary, plaintiff may file a reply upon leave of Court. Signed by Judge Donald E Walter on 6/10/14. (crt,Kennedy, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sibley v. Allstate Insurance Co et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Co
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Co of Boston
Represented By: Daisy Gurdian Kane(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Iwana Rademaekers(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Rene' E Thorne
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert C Sibley, Jr
Represented By: William T Allison(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]