TruSouth Oil L L C v. Burlington Insurance Co et al

Plaintiff: Trusouth Oil L L C
Defendant: Burlington Insurance Co, First Financial Insurance Co and PetroTech Energy L L C
 
Case Number: 5:2011cv00493
Filed: March 28, 2011
 
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Caddo
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
 
Nature of Suit: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2012 133 Featured Case MEMORANDUM RULING: denying 63 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 66 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 113 Motion to Strike. granting 65 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and granting 67 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, and all claims for negligence and based on the LPLA are dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 9/28/12. (crt,Delgado, S)
October 1, 2012 134 Featured Case MEMORANDUM RULING: denying 64 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 10/01/12. (crt,Delgado, S)
October 2, 2012 135 Featured Case MEMORANDUM RULING: denying 68 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 86 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 10/2/12. (crt,Delgado, S)
November 2, 2012 146 Featured Case MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 137 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 11/2/2012. (crt,Dauterive, C)
June 29, 2011 14 Featured Case MEMORANDUM ORDER re 12 MOTION to Dismiss First Financial Insurance Company. The parties are notified that the court will consider the affidavit submitted by First Financial and treat the Motion as one for Summary Judgment. Any opposing parties should submit any competing summary judgment materials within the time permitted by the briefing schedule issued by the Clerk of Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 6/29/2011. (crt,Dauterive, C)
December 13, 2012 196 Featured Case MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 148 Motion in Limine; denying 149 Motion in Limine; denying 152 Motion in Limine; denying 154 Motion in Limine; denying 155 Motion in Limine; denying 156 Motion in Limine; denying 157 Motion in Limine; de nying 158 Motion in Limine; denying 159 Motion in Limine; denying 160 Motion in Limine; denying 168 Motion to Amend Answer; denying 172 Motion to Take Judicial Notice; denying 186 Motion to Strike Declaration of Victoria Kats. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 12/13/2012. (crt,Keifer, K)
December 19, 2012 197 Featured Case MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 98 Daubert Motion; denying 99 Daubert Motion; denying 100 Daubert Motion; denying 101 Daubert Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 12/19/2012. (crt,Dauterive, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: TruSouth Oil L L C v. Burlington Insurance Co et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trusouth Oil L L C
Represented By: J Benjamin Warren, Jr
Represented By: Sarah E Smith
Represented By: Lee H Ayres
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burlington Insurance Co
Represented By: Andre' C Gaudin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Financial Insurance Co
Represented By: Andre' C Gaudin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PetroTech Energy L L C
Represented By: Andre' C Gaudin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]