Davidson et al v. Georgia Pacific L L C et al

Plaintiff: Tina Davidson, Kathryn D Davidson and Kristen M Davidson
Defendant: Georgia Pacific L L C, Union Carbide Corp, Certainteed Corp, Beazer East Inc, Advocate Mines L T D, J Graves Insulation Co Inc and Taylor Seidenbach Inc
 
Case Number: 5:2012cv01463
Filed: June 1, 2012
 
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Bossier
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Presiding Judge: Tom Stagg
 
Nature of Suit: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 6, 2014 107 Featured Case ORDER denying 70 Plaintiffs' request to clarify the sufficiency of their expert report disclosures. ORDER denying 84 Motion to Strike as to Dr. David Schwartz and Mr. William Ewing, but granted as to Dr. Arnold Brody. ODER granting 70 Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Rule 26-compliant expert reports as to Dr. David Schwartz and Mr. William Ewing but denied as to Dr Arnold Brody. FURTHER ORDER vacating the 45 Scheduling Order. An amended one will issue in due course. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 1/6/14. (crt,Crawford, A)
February 28, 2014 111 Featured Case MEMORANDUM RULING for the foregoing reasons, defendants' 77 , 79 , and 81 motions for partial summary judgment are GRANTED. Signed by Judge Donald E Walter for Judge Tom Stagg on 2/28/2014. (crt,Joffrion, B)
September 24, 2012 26 Featured Case MEMORANDUM RULING: The Motion to Remand 15 is granted, and subject to the stay in the attached order, this matter is remanded to the 26th Judicial District Court in Bossier Parish, Louisiana, where it was pending as Case #138861, Division B. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 9/24/12. (crt,Delgado, S)
April 24, 2013 39 Featured Case MEMORANDUM RULING re 30 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge filed by Certainteed Corp and 31 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge filed by Georgia Pacific L L C re 26 Memorandum Ruling and 27 Order on 15 Motion to Remand. Magistrate Judge Hornsby's 27 Order and 26 Memorandum Ruling are REVERSED. Therefore the 15 MOTION to Remand is DENIED. All claims against J Graves Insulation Co Inc and Taylor Seidenbach Inc are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Tom Stagg on 4/23/2013. (crt,Dauterive, C)
June 20, 2012 8 Featured Case MEMORANDUM ORDER re 1 Notice of Removal filed by Georgia Pacific L L C. Georgia Pacific will be allowed until July 9, 2012 to file an Amended Notice of Removal and allege its citizenship (Compliance Deadline set for 7/9/2012). Plaintiffs will be allowed until July 19, 2012 to file any Motion to Remand that challenges the improper joinder plea (Second Compliance Deadline set for 7/19/2012). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 6/20/2012. (crt,Dauterive, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Davidson et al v. Georgia Pacific L L C et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Davidson
Represented By: Frank Joseph Swarr
Represented By: Mickey P Landry
Represented By: Philip Charles Hoffman
Represented By: Susannah Chester-Schindler
Represented By: David R Cannella
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn D Davidson
Represented By: Susannah Chester-Schindler
Represented By: David R Cannella
Represented By: Philip Charles Hoffman
Represented By: Mickey P Landry
Represented By: Frank Joseph Swarr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen M Davidson
Represented By: David R Cannella
Represented By: Susannah Chester-Schindler
Represented By: Philip Charles Hoffman
Represented By: Mickey P Landry
Represented By: Frank Joseph Swarr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Pacific L L C
Represented By: Michael H Abraham
Represented By: Jennifer E Adams
Represented By: Gregory M Anding
Represented By: Allison Naquin Benoit
Represented By: Gary A Bezet
Represented By: Janice M Culotta
Represented By: Robert E Dille
Represented By: Douglas R Elliott
Represented By: Carol Louise Galloway
Represented By: Barrye Panepinto Miyagi
Represented By: Gayla M Moncla
Represented By: H Philip Radecker, Jr
Represented By: Sarah Katharine Weissman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corp
Represented By: Michael H Abraham
Represented By: Jennifer E Adams
Represented By: Douglas R Elliott
Represented By: Gayla M Moncla
Represented By: H Philip Radecker, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certainteed Corp
Represented By: Michael H Abraham
Represented By: Jennifer E Adams
Represented By: Douglas R Elliott
Represented By: Gayla M Moncla
Represented By: H Philip Radecker, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beazer East Inc
Represented By: Michael H Abraham
Represented By: Jennifer E Adams
Represented By: Douglas R Elliott
Represented By: Gayla M Moncla
Represented By: H Philip Radecker, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advocate Mines L T D
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Graves Insulation Co Inc
Represented By: Michael H Abraham
Represented By: Jennifer E Adams
Represented By: Douglas R Elliott
Represented By: Gayla M Moncla
Represented By: Lawrence G Pugh, III
Represented By: H Philip Radecker, Jr
Represented By: Shelley L Thompson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Seidenbach Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]