P H I Inc v. Office & Professional Employees International Union et al

 
Case Number: 6:2006cv01469
Filed: August 28, 2006
 
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
Presiding Judge: Rebecca F Doherty
Referring Judge: C Michael Hill
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 45:151 Railway Labor Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 7, 2009 324 Featured Case MEMORANDUM RULING re 315 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Supplemental Complaint For Injunctive And Other Relief Under The Railway Labor Act In The Return To Work Suit filed by Local 108 Office & Professional Employees International Union, Office & Professional Employees International Union, 316 MOTION for Leave to File Unions' Amended Answer To PHI's Complaint And Unions' Fifth Amended Counterclaim In Bad Faith Bargaining Suit by Office & Professional Employees International Union, Local 108 Office & Professional Employees International Union. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 1/7/09. (crt,Roaix, G) Modified on 1/8/2009 to create link to appropriate pleading (Reasor, Mary).
January 7, 2009 326 Featured Case MEMORANDUM RULING re 303 MOTION to Dismiss Louisiana-Law Payroll Deduction Claims Filed by Various Pilots filed by P H I Inc, 306 Corrective Document, filed by P H I Inc. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 1/7/09. (crt,Roaix, G)
January 26, 2009 336 Featured Case MEMORANDUM RULING re [303 & 306] MOTION to Dismiss Louisiana-Law Payroll Deduction Claims Filed by Various Pilots filed by P H I Inc. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 1/26/2009. (crt,Keifer, K)
January 27, 2009 338 Featured Case MEMORANDUM RULING re 316 MOTION for Leave to File Unions' Amended Answer To PHI's Complaint And Unions' Fifth Amended Counterclaim In Bad Faith Bargaining Suit filed by Local 108 Office & Professional Employees International Union, Office & Professional Employees International Union. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 1/27/2009. (crt,Keifer, K)
April 9, 2009 369 Featured Case MEMORANDUM RULING regarding Louisiana Wage Deduction Claims. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 4/9/2009. (crt,Keifer, K)
May 8, 2009 378 Featured Case MEMORANDUM RULING re 363 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE TRIAL TESTIMONY OF INDIVIDUAL PILOT PLAINTIFF/COUNTERCLAIMANT TERRY COOK filed by P H I Inc. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 5/8/2009. (crt,Keifer, K)
May 8, 2009 380 Featured Case MEMORANDUM RULING AND ORDER denying as moot 371 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 5/8/2009. (crt,Keifer, K)
May 28, 2009 391 Featured Case MEMORANDUM RULING re 359 MOTION in Limine filed by P H I Inc. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 5/28/2009. (crt,Keifer, K)
May 28, 2009 393 Featured Case MEMORANDUM RULING re 362 MOTION in Limine filed by P H I Inc. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 5/28/2009. (crt,Keifer, K)
June 2, 2009 395 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 272 Non-compliance of seventeen individual pilot complainants with this court's discovery orders Objections to R&R due by 6/19/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill on 6/2/09. (crt,Roaix, G)
June 11, 2009 420 Featured Case JUDGMENT re 395 Report and Recommendations. The decision of the magistrate judge is affirmed and the claims of Larry Burgoyne, Michael Butler, Thuong Tran Duc, Daniel Goodson, Joseph Gubler, Frank Haynes, Adam Hite, James Pecnik, Richard Phelps, Jo hn Rohner, William Rosenbalm, Dennis Smith, David Squires, Michael Stricklin, Jerold Swinderman and Stephen Torres are dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with this court's discovery orders. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before the close of business on 6/12/2009, the Unions shall submit to this Court and PHI a one-page summary of the claims alleged by Mr. Norman A Sherman, Jr. against PHI. The Court will discuss this matter at the 6/17/2009 pretrial conference. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 6/11/2009. (crt,Keifer, K)
July 9, 2010 461 Featured Case MEMORANDUM RULING re 455 MOTION to Dismiss PHI, Inc.'s First Amended Complaint For Declaratory Judgment And Permanent Injunctive Relief In The Bargaining Suit and 456 MOTION to Dismiss the Unions' RLA-Based Counter Claims in the Bargaining Suit filed by P H I Inc. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 7/9/2010. (crt,Keifer, K)
July 14, 2010 465 Featured Case AMENDED MEMORANDUM RULING re 461 Memorandum Ruling. This Court adopts and incorporates by reference the entirety of this Court's 461 Memorandum Ruling issued 7/9/2010 with the clarifications outlined in this Amended Memorandum Ruling. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 7/13/2010. (crt,Keifer, K)
July 30, 2010 475 Featured Case MEMORANDUM RULING re 463 MOTION to Dismiss The Unions' Claims In The Return to Work Suit filed by P H I Inc. is GRANTED in its entirety, and all claims alleged by the Unions in the Return to Work Case are DENIED AND DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. G iven this Court's ruling, the Court need not address the alternative grounds for dismissal contained within PHI's motion. Indeed, because this Court concludes it lacks jurisdiction to award equitable and/or injunctive relief to the Unions in the Return to Work Case, this Court finds it would be improper to address the merits of the alternative grounds alleged in PHI's motion at this juncture.. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 7/30/10. (crt,Guidry, C)
August 3, 2010 479 Featured Case MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Rebecca F Doherty: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 8/3/2010. 468 Motion to Dismiss DENIED as premature. Granting in part and denying in part 471 Motion to Set Abbreviated Scheduling Order Related to Count I I of Fifth Amended Counterclaim. Granting in part and denying in part 472 Motion to Expedite. Denying as MOOT 477 Motion for Discovery. Denying as MOOT 478 Motion to Expedite. Please refer to pdf attached to view various deadlines set by the Court. (Court Reporter: Cathleen Marquardt) (crt,Smith, C)
September 15, 2010 516 Featured Case ORDER re 503 Notice of Appeal, 504 Proposed Administrative Order/Judgment. As there are matters that remain active in the Bad Faith Bargaining Case, this Court recognizes the record should remain with the district court. Therefore, the instant Or der, directing the Clerk of Court to retain the record until all pending matters before this Court are concluded pursuant to Rule 11(e) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure, is granted. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 9/14/2010. (crt,Alexander, E)
September 27, 2010 522 Featured Case MEMORANDUM RULING re 482 MOTION to Dismiss Count II of the Unions' and Individual Pilots' Fifth Amended CounterClaim filed by P H I Inc. For the following reasons, the motion is GRANTED, and the Unions' wage claims contained in Count II of the Unions' and Individual Pilots' Fifth Amended Counterclaim are DENIED AND DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The instant ruling resolves all remaining claims and disputes between the parties in the two consolidated cases. Now that the C ourt has dismissed all claims raised by the parties in the consolidated cases, IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall submit a Final Judgment, approved as to form, as to each and/or both consolidated cases pending before the Court, within ten (10) days of the date of this Ruling. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 09/24/10. (crt,Guidry, C)
November 15, 2010 534 Featured Case RULING AND ORDER - This Court has previously dismissed all pending claims in the Return to Work Case, Civil Action No. 06-2243,, which is consolidated with the Bargaining Case, Civil Action No. 06-1469. Although the parties agree neither party should be awarded costs upon the entry of final judgment in the Bargaining Case, PHI argues it is entitled to costs upon the entry of final judgment in the Return to Work Case; the Union objects. At the order of the Court, the parties briefed the issue, an d the Court now issues its ruling. Considering the foregoing, it is ORDERED that the final judgment in the Return to Work case, to be issued under separate cover, will not include an award of costs to PHI. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 11/12/10. (crt,Guidry, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: P H I Inc v. Office & Professional Employees International Union et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]