v. Rentrop Tugs Inc

Defendant: Rentrop Tugs Inc, Mallard Towing L L C, Dupre Marine Transportation Inc, A G C S Marine Insurance Co, Great American Insurance Co, Catlin Insurance Co U K Ltd, Catlin Insurance Co Inc and 1861 Lloyds Syndicate
Plaintiff: T Moore Services L L C
 
Case Number: 6:2010cv01221
Filed: August 2, 2010
 
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Lafayette
 
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 2, 2012 135 Featured Case MEMORANDUM RULING granting in part and denying in part 124 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. More particularly, the motion is denied with regard to the defendant-towers request that the value of Rig 61 be fixed. The motion is granted with regar d to T. Moores request for damages resulting from its going out of business (Paragraph 36(d) of the complaint) and with regard to T. Moores request for damages arising from third party business interruption claims (Paragraph 36(F) of the complaint), and T. Moore will be barred from recovering damages in those categories. In all other respects, the motion is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 3/2/2012. (crt,Kennedy, T)
January 20, 2011 71 Featured Case MEMORANDUM RULING AND ORDER: It is ORDERED that the United States 54 Motion for Leave to File Complaint 54 Motion to Lift or Modify Stay; 54 Motion to Consolidate Cases is GRANTED and the Clerk of this Court is to lift the stay in this consoli dated limitation action in order for the United States to file its complaint within 15 days of the entry of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that upon filing its complaint, the United States may file a motion to withdraw its claim in the limitation proceedings in this action [Rec. Doc. 38] and to consolidate its complaint with the previously consolidated actions herein. Signed by Judge Tucker L Melancon on 1/19/2011. (crt,Alexander, E) Modified text on 1/20/2011. (Alexander, E)
March 17, 2011 90 Featured Case JUDGMENT ADOPTING 83 Report and Recommendations: It is ORDERED that the 58 Motion to Dismiss the claim filed on behalf of Texon DistributingL P, which was filed by Transinland Marine Inc, Rentrop Tugs Inc, Mallard Towing L L C, T & R Tugs L L C and Dupre Marine Transportation Inc is hereby GRANTED and Texon's claim is hereby DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Tucker L Melancon on 3/17/2011. (crt,Smith, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: v. Rentrop Tugs Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rentrop Tugs Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallard Towing L L C
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dupre Marine Transportation Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A G C S Marine Insurance Co
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Insurance Co
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catlin Insurance Co U K Ltd
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catlin Insurance Co Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1861 Lloyds Syndicate
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T Moore Services L L C
Represented By: Randolph W Hunter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]