SANDLER v. CALCAGNI et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Shana Sandler alleges that Defendants Mia Calcagni and Emet Gabar collaborated to write a book entitled \"Help Us Get Mia.\" The book was published by Defendant Booksurge, LLC and allegedly contained false and defamatory statements.

Plaintiff: SHANA SANDLER
Defendant: RALPH CALCAGNI, MAUREEN CALCAGNI and PETERS MARS
Cross_claimant: PETERS MARS, MAUREEN CALCAGNI and RALPH CALCAGNI
Cross_defendant: PETERS MARS
Case Number: 1:2007cv00029
Filed: February 27, 2007
Court: Maine District Court
Office: Bangor Office
Referring Judge: MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK
Presiding Judge: GEORGE Z. SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 17, 2008 100
ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by BOOKSURGE LLC re 98 Affidavit,,,,,,, Exhibit H to Matthew Segal Declaration. Main Document: Exhibit H. (SEGAL, MATTHEW)
March 17, 2008 101
MOTION for Oral Argument/Hearing re 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Cross-Claim of Defs. R. & M. Calcagni , 96 MOTION for Summary Judgment on all Claims of Plaintiff S. Sandler & Incorp. Memo. of Law (Redacted) by BOOKSURGE LLCResponses due by 4/7/2008. (SEGAL, MATTHEW) Modified on 5/6/2008 to remove redacted from text from no. 97(lrc).
March 17, 2008 102
STATEMENT OF FACT in Support of Motions for Summary Judgment by BOOKSURGE LLC. (SEGAL, MATTHEW)
March 17, 2008 104
**DOCUMENT STRICKEN- See pleading no. 160 and 161**MOTION for Summary Judgment on all claims of plaintiff Shana Sandler & incorporated memo of law by PETERS MARSResponses due by 4/7/2008. (DRUARY, J.) Modified on 5/7/2008 to clean up docket text(lrc). Modified on 7/16/2008 to reflect this document it stricken per order issued by Judge Singal on July 16, 2008 (lrc).
March 17, 2008 107
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BOOKSURGE LLC re 100 Additional Attachments, 99 Affidavit, 105 Sealed Document, 106 Sealed Document, 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 101 MOTION for Oral Argument/Hearing re 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 96 MOTION for Summary Judgment on all Claims of Plaintiff S. Sandler & Incorp. Memo. of Law (Redacted) MOTION for Oral Argument/Hearing re 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment 96 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 104 MOTION for Summary Judgment 98 Affidavit, 102 Statement of Fact, 96 MOTION for Summary Judgment 103 Sealed Document (SEGAL, MATTHEW) Modified on 5/6/2008 to remove redacted from text from 97 and clean up docket text(lrc).
March 19, 2008 109
REPORT OF CONFERENCE OF COUNSEL AND ORDER. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK. (CWP)
April 2, 2008 110
RESPONSE in Opposition re 87 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Redacted) filed by BOOKSURGE LLC.Reply due by 4/14/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment A Part I, # 2 Exhibit Attachment A Part II)(SEGAL, MATTHEW)
April 2, 2008 111
RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS WITH ADDITIONAL STATEMENT OF FACTS (REDACTED) by BOOKSURGE LLC. (SEGAL, MATTHEW) Modified on 4/3/2008 to correct the event used for this docket event (mjlt).
April 2, 2008 113
AFFIDAVIT of Matthew J. Segal re 110 Response in Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by BOOKSURGE LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(SEGAL, MATTHEW)
April 2, 2008 114
AFFIDAVIT of David Symonds re 110 Response in Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by BOOKSURGE LLC. (SEGAL, MATTHEW)
April 2, 2008 115
AFFIDAVIT of Roy Francia re 110 Response in Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by BOOKSURGE LLC. (SEGAL, MATTHEW)
April 2, 2008 116
AFFIDAVIT of Steve Weinberg re 110 Response in Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by BOOKSURGE LLC. (SEGAL, MATTHEW)
April 3, 2008 117
RESPONSE to Statement of Fact of Booksurge filed by PETERS MARS. (DRUARY, J.)
April 3, 2008 118
AFFIDAVIT of J. William Druary Jr. in support of Response to Booksurge's Statement of Material Facts filed by PETERS MARS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A deposition of Peter Mars)(DRUARY, J.) Modified on 4/4/2008 to remove duplicate description of attachment(mjlt).
May 1, 2007 11
ANSWER to Complaint by BOOKSURGE LLC.(WRIGHT, STEVEN)
April 7, 2008 120
MOTION Exceed Page Limits in Responding to Booksurge's Motion for Summary Judgment by SHANA SANDLERResponses due by 4/28/2008. (KUBETZ, BERNARD)
April 8, 2008 121
MOTION to Extend Time April 24, 2008 to Reply to Booksurge's Memorandum Opposing Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by SHANA SANDLERResponses due by 4/29/2008. (KUBETZ, BERNARD)
April 14, 2008 124
RESPONSE to Statement of Fact filed by Booksurge in opposition to Shana Sandler's motion for partial summary judgment filed by PETERS MARS. (DRUARY, J.)
April 14, 2008 125
RESPONSE to Motion re 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Cross-Claim of Defs. R. & M. Calcagni Response of Defendants Ralph and Maureen Calcagni to BookSurge, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment on Cross-claim filed by RALPH CALCAGNI, MAUREEN CALCAGNI.Reply due by 4/25/2008. (MALLONEE, BRUCE) Modified on 5/6/2008 to remove redacted from text(lrc).
April 14, 2008 126
**DOCUMENT STRICKEN- See pleading no. 160 and 161**MOTION for Summary Judgment with Incorporated Memorandum of Law by RALPH CALCAGNI, MAUREEN CALCAGNIResponses due by 5/5/2008. (MALLONEE, BRUCE) Modified on 5/7/2008 to clean up the docket text(mjlt). Modified on 7/16/2008 to reflect this document is stricken per order issued by Judge Singal on July 16, 2008(lrc).
April 14, 2008 127
AFFIDAVIT of J. William Druary Jr. in support of Peter Mars' response to Booksurge's statement of additional material facts in opposition to plaintiff Shana Sandler's partial motion for summary judgment filed by PETERS MARS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Peter Mars deposition)(DRUARY, J.)
April 14, 2008 128
RESPONSE to Statement of Fact filed by RALPH CALCAGNI, MAUREEN CALCAGNI. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Ralph A. Calcagni, # 2 Affidavit of Maureen Calcagni)(MALLONEE, BRUCE) Modified on 4/15/2008 to clean up the docket text and remove duplicate description of attachments (mjlt).
April 14, 2008 129
RESPONSE in Opposition re 104 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 96 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by SHANA SANDLER.Reply due by 4/25/2008. (KUBETZ, BERNARD) Modified on 5/7/2008 to clean up docket text(lrc).
May 2, 2007 12
ANSWER to Complaint by MIA CALCAGNI.(MALLONEE, BRUCE)
April 14, 2008 130
RESPONSE to Statement of Fact (Redacted) with Statement of Additional Facts filed by SHANA SANDLER. (KUBETZ, BERNARD)
April 14, 2008 131
AFFIDAVIT of Bernard J. Kubetz re 130 Response to Statement of Fact with Statement of Additional Facts filed by SHANA SANDLER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Kubetz Declaration - Resume, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Kubetz Declaration - Report, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Kubetz Declaration - Excerpts from Fernald Deposition, # 4 Exhibit 4 to Kubetz Declaration - Excerpts from Ralph Calcagni Deposition)(KUBETZ, BERNARD)
April 15, 2008 135
MOTION to Strike 126 MOTION for Summary Judgment by SHANA SANDLERResponses due by 5/6/2008. (KUBETZ, BERNARD) Modified on 5/7/2008 to clean up the docket text(mjlt).
April 18, 2008 136
Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time 05/05/2008 to Reply to Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment by BOOKSURGE LLCResponses due by 5/9/2008. (VANDERSTOEP, KARI)
April 18, 2008 137
MOTION To Exceed Page Limits to Reply to Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by BOOKSURGE LLCResponses due by 5/9/2008. (VANDERSTOEP, KARI)
May 4, 2007 13
AFFIDAVIT of Service by SHANA SANDLER. MIA CALCAGNI served on 4/19/2007. (KUBETZ, BERNARD) Modified on 5/4/07 for QC purposes (jgw).
April 24, 2008 140
REPLY to Response to Motion re 87 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Redacted) filed by SHANA SANDLER. (KUBETZ, BERNARD)
April 24, 2008 141
REPLY TO ADDITIONAL Statement of Fact filed by SHANA SANDLER. (KUBETZ, BERNARD)
April 25, 2008 142
MOTION to Extend Time (Ten Days After Ruling on Motion to Strike) to Respond Pleading No. by SHANA SANDLERResponses due by 5/16/2008. (KUBETZ, BERNARD) Modified on 5/7/2008 to clean up the docket text (mjlt).
May 1, 2008 143
RESPONSE in Opposition re 135 MOTION to Strike 126 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by RALPH CALCAGNI and MAUREEN CALCAGNIS'.Reply due by 5/12/2008. (MALLONEE, BRUCE) Modified on 5/2/2008 to to add Maureen Calcagnis as a filer of this document (mjlt).
May 1, 2008 144
RESPONSE in Opposition re 142 MOTION to Extend Time (Ten Days After Ruling on Motion to Strike) to Respond to Defendants Ralph and Maureen Calcagni's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by BOOKSURGE LLC.Reply due by 5/12/2008. (FRIEDMAN, HAROLD)
May 5, 2008 145
REPLY to Response to Motion re 104 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by PETERS MARS. (DRUARY, J.) Modified on 5/6/2008 to insert a link to 104 and not 96 as previously noted and to clean up docket text(lrc).
May 5, 2008 146
REPLY to Response to Motion re 96 MOTION for Summary Judgment on all Claims of Plaintiff S. Sandler & Incorp. Memo. of Law (Redacted) BookSurge, LLC's Reply Memorandum for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claims (Redacted) filed by BOOKSURGE LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Appendix B, # 3 Appendix C)(SEGAL, MATTHEW) Modified on 5/6/2008 to remove duplicate text(lrc).
May 5, 2008 147
REPLY TO ADDITIONAL Statement of Fact BookSurge, LLC's Reply Statement of Material Facts and Incorp Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Facts 59-62 (Redacted) filed by BOOKSURGE LLC. (SEGAL, MATTHEW)
May 5, 2008 148
Affidavit of Matthew J. Segal in Support of BookSurge's Reply Memorandum filed by BOOKSURGE LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(SEGAL, MATTHEW) Modified on 5/6/2008 to indicate this is an affidavit and not a reply and to remove duplicate exhibit text(lrc).
May 5, 2008 149
REPLY to Response to Motion re 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Cross-Claim of Defs. R. & M. Calcagni filed by BOOKSURGE LLC. (SEGAL, MATTHEW) Modified on 5/6/2008 to remove duplicate docket text(lrc). Modified on 5/6/2008 to remove redacted from text(lrc).
May 5, 2008 150
RESPONSE to Motion re 142 MOTION to Extend Time (Ten Days After Ruling on Motion to Strike) to Respond to Defendants Ralph and Maureen Calcagni's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by RALPH CALCAGNI, MAUREEN CALCAGNI.Reply due by 5/16/2008. (MALLONEE, BRUCE)
May 5, 2008 151
RESPONSE to Request to Strike Per LR 56(e) re docket no. 128 filed by BOOKSURGE LLC. (SEGAL, MATTHEW) Modified on 5/6/2008 to remove extra docket text(lrc).
May 5, 2008 152
RESPONSE to Request to Strike Per LR 56(e) re docket no. 117 filed by BOOKSURGE LLC. (SEGAL, MATTHEW) Modified on 5/6/2008 to remove extra docket text(lrc).
May 6, 2008 156
JOINDER REPLY To Response Motion re 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Cross-Claim of Defs. R. & M. Calcagni filed by RALPH CALCAGNI, MAUREEN CALCAGNI. (MALLONEE, BRUCE) Modified on 5/6/2008 to reflect this is a joinder in reply and to clean up the docket text(mjlt).
May 6, 2008 157
REPLY to Response to Motion re 135 MOTION to Strike 126 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by SHANA SANDLER. (KUBETZ, BERNARD) Modified on 5/7/2008 to clean up the docket text (mjlt).
May 16, 2008 158
RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO STRIKE PER LOCAL RULE 56(e) filed by SHANA SANDLER.(KUBETZ, BERNARD) Modified on 5/19/2008 to correct the event title of this docket entry and to remove the reply deadline generated in this docket entry (mjlt).
May 16, 2008 159
AFFIDAVIT of Michael R. Clisham filed by SHANA SANDLER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpts from Fernald Deposition)(KUBETZ, BERNARD)
May 7, 2007 15
REPORT OF CONFERENCE OF COUNSEL AND ORDER. By Judge MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK. (CWP, )
July 16, 2008 160 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER ON MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION denying 87 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 96 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 97 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 101 Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing; striking 104 Motion for Summary Judgment; striking 126 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 135 Motion to Strike By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
July 29, 2008 162
TRIAL LIST:. On Trial List for 10/7/2008. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/4/2008 09:00 AM in Magistrate Judge Kravchuk's Chambers before MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK. Final Pretrial Memo due by 8/28/2008.(lrc)
May 7, 2007 16
NOTICE of Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Matthew Segal and Stephen Smith filed by STEVEN P. WRIGHT on behalf of BOOKSURGE LLC (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Matthew Segal# 2 Affidavit Affidavit of Stephen Smith)(WRIGHT, STEVEN)
May 23, 2007 17
TEMPORARY ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK recused. By Judge MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK. (CWP, )
May 24, 2007 18
MOTION to Amend , Motion to Dismiss Defendants and Join Defendants by SHANA SANDLER WITH INCORPORATED MEMO.Responses due by 6/14/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint# 2 Exhibit 1 - Consent Decree and Permanent Injunction)(KUBETZ, BERNARD)
June 14, 2007 19
RESPONSE to Motion re 18 MOTION to Amend , Motion to Dismiss Defendants and Join Defendants filed by BOOKSURGE LLC.Reply due by 6/25/2007. (WRIGHT, STEVEN)
February 27, 2007 1
COMPLAINT against MIA CALCAGNI, EMET GABAR, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE, BOOKSURGE LLC with Jury Demand

IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD, COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO IMMEDIATELY LOGIN TO CM/ECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY.

IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CHECK, THE COURT REQUIRES RECEIPT OF PAYMENT WITHIN 48 HOURS OF THIS FILING., filed by SHANA SANDLER.(Service of Process Deadline 6/27/2007) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - State Court Consent Decree and Permanent Injunction)(err, )

June 15, 2007 20
REPLY to Response to Motion re 18 MOTION to Amend , Motion to Dismiss Defendants and Join Defendants filed by SHANA SANDLER. (KUBETZ, BERNARD)
June 20, 2007 21
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BOOKSURGE LLC. (WRIGHT, STEVEN)
June 21, 2007 22 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge D. BROCK HORNBY recused. Case reassigned to Judge GEORGE Z. SINGAL for all further proceedings By Judge D. BROCK HORNBY. (lng)
June 28, 2007 23 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting 18 Motion to Amend. REMINDER: After entry of this Order, if Amending a COMPLAINT, counsel are REQUIRED to separately file the AMENDED COMPLAINT Document. By Judge GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (mjlt, )
June 28, 2007 24
AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants with Jury Demand, filed by SHANA SANDLER.(Service of Process Deadline 10/26/2007) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Consent Agreement)(KUBETZ, BERNARD)
June 29, 2007 25
Summons Issued as to RALPH CALCAGNI, MAUREEN CALCAGNI, PETERS MARS.

Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4.

Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting).

(Attachments: # 1 Summons Issued As To Peter Mars# 2 Summons Issued As To Ralph Calcagni)(mjlt, )

July 17, 2007 26
MOTION for Attachment & Trustee Process by SHANA SANDLER WITH INCORPORATED MEMO.Responses due by 8/7/2007. (KUBETZ, BERNARD)
July 17, 2007 27
AFFIDAVIT of Shana Sandler re 26 MOTION for Attachment & Trustee Process filed by SHANA SANDLER. (KUBETZ, BERNARD)
July 17, 2007 28
AFFIDAVIT of Bernard J. Kubetz re 26 MOTION for Attachment & Trustee Process filed by SHANA SANDLER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Maureen Calcagni# 2 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Ralph Calcagni# 3 Exhibit 3 - Real Estate Listing)(KUBETZ, BERNARD)
July 18, 2007 29
SUMMONS Returned Executed MAUREEN CALCAGNI served on 7/13/2007. (KUBETZ, BERNARD)
February 28, 2007 2
Summons Issued (Mia Calcagni) as to MIA CALCAGNI, BOOKSURGE LLC.

Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4.

Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting).

(Attachments: # 1 Summons - Booksurge LLC)(err, )

July 18, 2007 30
SUMMONS Returned Executed RALPH CALCAGNI served on 7/13/2007. (KUBETZ, BERNARD)
July 18, 2007 31
ANSWER to Amended Complaint by BOOKSURGE LLC.(WRIGHT, STEVEN)
July 19, 2007 32
Certificate of Filing of Complaint. Original attested document forwarded to counsel for plaintiff. (err, )
July 20, 2007 33
NOTICE of Appearance by J. WILLIAM DRUARY, JR on behalf of PETERS MARS (DRUARY, J.)
July 24, 2007 34
Amended MOTION for Attachment & Trustee Process by SHANA SANDLER WITH INCORPORATED MEMO.Responses due by 8/14/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(KUBETZ, BERNARD)
August 2, 2007 35
SUMMONS Returned Executed PETERS MARS served on 7/31/2007. (KUBETZ, BERNARD)
August 2, 2007 36
ANSWER to Amended Complaint by RALPH CALCAGNI, MAUREEN CALCAGNI, MIA CALCAGNI.(MALLONEE, BRUCE)
August 14, 2007 37
ANSWER to Amended Complaint by PETERS MARS.(DRUARY, J.)
August 14, 2007 38
MOTION to Extend Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Approval of Attachment and Trustee Process by RALPH CALCAGNI, MAUREEN CALCAGNI.Responses due by 9/4/2007. (MALLONEE, BRUCE)
March 15, 2007 3
MOTION for Service by Publication by SHANA SANDLER WITH INCORPORATED MEMO.Responses due by 4/5/2007. (KUBETZ, BERNARD)
August 14, 2007 40 Opinion or Order of the Court
SCHEDULING ORDER:Discovery due by 1/15/2008.Motions due by 2/5/2008.Ready for Trial on 5/5/2008. By Judge DAVID M. COHEN. (mnw, )
August 15, 2007 41
RESPONSE to Motion re 34 Amended MOTION for Attachment & Trustee Process filed by RALPH CALCAGNI, MAUREEN CALCAGNI.Reply due by 8/27/2007. (MALLONEE, BRUCE)
August 15, 2007 42
AFFIDAVIT of Maureen T. Calcagni in Opposition to Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Approval of Attachment and Trustee Process filed by MAUREEN CALCAGNI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K# 12 Exhibit L# 13 Exhibit M# 14 Exhibit N# 15 Exhibit O# 16 Exhibit P# 17 Exhibit Q)(MALLONEE, BRUCE)
August 17, 2007 43
REPLY to Response to Motion re 34 Amended MOTION for Attachment & Trustee Process filed by SHANA SANDLER. (KUBETZ, BERNARD)
August 21, 2007 44 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER denying 34 Amended Motion for Attachment & Trustee Process By Judge DAVID M. COHEN. (jgw, )
September 7, 2007 45
Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time through September 24, 2007 for Initial Disclosure by RALPH CALCAGNI, MAUREEN CALCAGNI, MIA CALCAGNI.Responses due by 9/28/2007. (CHAIKEN, PAUL)
September 11, 2007 48 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER VACATING ORDER OF TEMPORARY RECUSAL. By Judge MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK. (CWP, )
October 11, 2007 49
Second MOTION to Amend Complaint by SHANA SANDLER WITH INCORPORATED MEMO.Responses due by 11/1/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Second Amended Complaint)(KUBETZ, BERNARD)
March 15, 2007 4
AFFIDAVIT of Bernard J. Kubetz re 3 MOTION for Service by Publication filed by SHANA SANDLER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Deputy Sheriff# 2 Exhibit B - Address Summary# 3 Exhibit C - Fraternity# 4 Exhibit D - Real Estate Licensee Detail# 5 Exhibit E - BMV Driving Record# 6 Exhibit F - Gabar search)(KUBETZ, BERNARD)
October 15, 2007 51
Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants with Jury Demand, filed by SHANA SANDLER.(Service of Process Deadline 2/12/2008) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Consent Decree)(KUBETZ, BERNARD)
October 17, 2007 52
MOTION to Extend Time 30 Days After Booksurge Deposition to Designate Experts by SHANA SANDLER WITH INCORPORATED MEMO.Responses due by 11/7/2007. (KUBETZ, BERNARD)
October 17, 2007 53 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER SETTING MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING AND SHORTENING RESPONSE TIME. By Judge MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK. (CWP, )
October 18, 2007 54
MOTION by Attorney Paul W. Chaiken, Esq. to Withdraw as Attorney by RALPH CALCAGNI, MAUREEN CALCAGNI, MIA CALCAGNI.Responses due by 11/8/2007. (MALLONEE, BRUCE)
October 24, 2007 56
ANSWER to Amended Complaint by PETERS MARS.(DRUARY, J.)
October 26, 2007 58
ANSWER to Amended Complaint by RALPH CALCAGNI, MAUREEN CALCAGNI, MIA CALCAGNI.(MALLONEE, BRUCE)
October 26, 2007 59
RESPONSE to Motion re 52 MOTION to Extend Time 30 Days After Booksurge Deposition to Designate Experts filed by BOOKSURGE LLC.Reply due by 11/6/2007. (WRIGHT, STEVEN)
October 26, 2007 60
AFFIDAVIT of Matthew J. Segal with Exhibits A, B, & C included within the main document re 52 MOTION to Extend Time 30 Days After Booksurge Deposition to Designate Experts, 59 Response to Motion of Plaintiff to Extend Time to Designate Experts filed by BOOKSURGE LLC. (WRIGHT, STEVEN) Modified on 10/29/2007 to reflect Exhibits A,B,& C are included within the main document(mjlt, ).
October 26, 2007 61
ANSWER to Amended Complaint of Shana Sandler, CROSSCLAIM against RALPH CALCAGNI, MAUREEN CALCAGNI by BOOKSURGE LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(WRIGHT, STEVEN)
October 29, 2007 63
REPORT OF TELEPHONE CONFERENCE AND ORDER granting in part 52 Motion to Extend Time. By Judge MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK. (CWP, )
October 29, 2007 64
ANSWER to Crossclaim, BookSurge, LLC's Amended ANSWER to Amended Complaint of Shana Sandler, Amended CROSSCLAIM against RALPH CALCAGNI, MAUREEN CALCAGNI by BOOKSURGE LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(WRIGHT, STEVEN) Modified on 10/30/2007 to remove duplicate language (mjlt, ).
November 2, 2007 65
Amended ANSWER to Amended Complaint and, CROSSCLAIM against RALPH CALCAGNI, MAUREEN CALCAGNI, MIA CALCAGNI by PETERS MARS.(DRUARY, J.)
November 2, 2007 67
REPORT OF TELEPHONE CONFERENCE AND ORDER. By Judge MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK. (CWP, )
November 7, 2007 68
MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Mia Calcagni by SHANA SANDLER WITH INCORPORATED MEMO.Responses due by 11/28/2007. (KUBETZ, BERNARD)
November 7, 2007 69
AFFIDAVIT of Bernard J. Kubetz re 68 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Mia Calcagni filed by SHANA SANDLER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Deposition of Mia Calcagni)(KUBETZ, BERNARD)
March 16, 2007 6 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER for service by publication By Judge MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK. (jgw, )
November 9, 2007 70
ANSWER to Crossclaim, CROSSCLAIM against BOOKSURGE LLC by RALPH CALCAGNI, MAUREEN CALCAGNI.(MALLONEE, BRUCE)
November 9, 2007 71
ANSWER to Crossclaim, CROSSCLAIM against PETERS MARS by RALPH CALCAGNI, MAUREEN CALCAGNI.(MALLONEE, BRUCE)
November 16, 2007 72
Answer to Answer to Crossclaim, 71 and Crossclaim against Defendant Peter Mars by PETERS MARS. (DRUARY, J.)
November 27, 2007 73
RESPONSE to Motion re 68 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Mia Calcagni filed by RALPH CALCAGNI, MAUREEN CALCAGNI, MIA CALCAGNI.Reply due by 12/10/2007. (MALLONEE, BRUCE)
November 27, 2007 74
AFFIDAVIT of Bruce C. Mallonee re 73 Response to Motion for Default filed by RALPH CALCAGNI, MAUREEN CALCAGNI, MIA CALCAGNI. (MALLONEE, BRUCE)
November 28, 2007 75
RESPONSE to Motion re 68 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Mia Calcagni filed by BOOKSURGE LLC.Reply due by 12/10/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(WRIGHT, STEVEN)
December 6, 2007 76
REPLY to Response to Motion re 68 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Mia Calcagni filed by SHANA SANDLER. (KUBETZ, BERNARD)
December 6, 2007 77
AFFIDAVIT of Bernard J. Kubetz re 76 Reply to Response to Motion filed by SHANA SANDLER. (Attachments: # 1 Report of Telephone Conference and Order)(KUBETZ, BERNARD)
December 19, 2007 79
NOTICE of Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Kari L. Vander Stoep filed by STEVEN P. WRIGHT on behalf of BOOKSURGE LLC (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Kari L. Vander Stoep Pro Hac Vice)(WRIGHT, STEVEN)
March 20, 2007 7
SUMMONS Returned Executed BOOKSURGE LLC served on 3/9/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(KUBETZ, BERNARD)
December 28, 2007 80
ANSWER to 70 Answer to Crossclaim, of Ralph and Maureen Calcagni by BOOKSURGE LLC.(WRIGHT, STEVEN)
January 18, 2008 81
MOTION for Order (Confidentiality) by SHANA SANDLERResponses due by 2/8/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Consent Confidentiality Order)(KUBETZ, BERNARD)
January 18, 2008 83
CONSENT CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK. (CWP)
February 6, 2008 84
NOTICE of Appearance by HAROLD J. FRIEDMAN on behalf of BOOKSURGE LLC (FRIEDMAN, HAROLD)
March 3, 2008 85
MOTION Motion of Defendant BookSurge, LLC for Leave to Exceed Page Limits with Incorporated Memorandum of Law by BOOKSURGE LLCResponses due by 3/24/2008. (FRIEDMAN, HAROLD)
March 5, 2008 87
MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Redacted) by SHANA SANDLERResponses due by 3/26/2008. (KUBETZ, BERNARD)
March 5, 2008 88
STATEMENT OF FACT (Redacted) by SHANA SANDLER. (KUBETZ, BERNARD)
March 5, 2008 89
AFFIDAVIT of Bernard J. Kubetz re 87 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Redacted) filed by SHANA SANDLER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Kubetz Affidavit - Excerpts from Symonds Deposition, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Kubetz Affidavit (Confidential), # 3 Exhibit 3 to Kubetz Affidavit - Author Publishing Agreement, # 4 Exhibit 4 to Kubetz Affidavit - Author Profile, # 5 Exhibit 5 to Kubetz Affidavit - Affidavit of Shana Sandler, # 6 Exhibit 6 to Kubetz Affidavit (Confidential), # 7 Exhibit 7 to Kubetz Affidavit - Excerpts from Help Us Get Mia)(KUBETZ, BERNARD)
April 18, 2007 8
NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN P. WRIGHT on behalf of BOOKSURGE LLC (WRIGHT, STEVEN)
March 12, 2008 95
REPORT OF TELEPHONE CONFERENCE OF COUNSEL AND ORDER Motions due by 3/17/2008. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK. (err)
March 17, 2008 96
MOTION for Summary Judgment on all Claims of Plaintiff S. Sandler & Incorp. Memo. of Law (Redacted) by BOOKSURGE LLCResponses due by 4/7/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Appendix B)(SEGAL, MATTHEW)
March 17, 2008 97
MOTION for Summary Judgment on Cross-Claim of Defs. R. & M. Calcagni by BOOKSURGE LLCResponses due by 4/7/2008. (SEGAL, MATTHEW) Modified on 5/6/2008 to remove redacted from text(lrc).
March 17, 2008 98
AFFIDAVIT of Matthew J. Segal re 96 MOTION for Summary Judgment on all Claims of Plaintiff S. Sandler & Incorp. Memo. of Law (Redacted), 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Cross-Claim of Defs. R. & M. Calcagni (Redacted) filed by BOOKSURGE LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit E-1, # 7 Exhibit E-2 Part 1, # 8 Exhibit E-2 Part 2, # 9 Exhibit E-4 Part 1, # 10 Exhibit E-4 part 2, # 11 Exhibit E-4 Part 3, # 12 Exhibit E-4 Part 4, # 13 Exhibit E-4 Part 5, # 14 Exhibit E-4 Part 6, # 15 Exhibit E-5, # 16 Exhibit F Part 1, # 17 Exhibit F Part 2, # 18 Exhibit F-8, # 19 Exhibit F-10, # 20 Exhibit F-11, # 21 Exhibit F-12, # 22 Exhibit F-13, # 23 Exhibit F-14, # 24 Exhibit F-16, # 25 Exhibit F-19, # 26 Exhibit F-26, # 27 Exhibit F-30, # 28 Exhibit F-31, # 29 Exhibit F-32, # 30 Exhibit F-33, # 31 Exhibit F-34, # 32 Exhibit F-35, # 33 Exhibit F-36, # 34 Exhibit F-37, # 35 Exhibit F-38, # 36 Exhibit F-39, # 37 Exhibit F-40, # 38 Exhibit F-41, # 39 Exhibit G, # 40 Exhibit H-12, # 41 Exhibit H-14, # 42 Exhibit H-15, # 43 Exhibit H-18, # 44 Exhibit H-24, # 45 Exhibit H-25, # 46 Exhibit H-26, # 47 Exhibit H-27, # 48 Exhibit H-28, # 49 Exhibit H-29, # 50 Exhibit H-30, # 51 Exhibit I, # 52 Exhibit I-4, # 53 Exhibit I-8, # 54 Exhibit J, # 55 Exhibit J-22, # 56 Exhibit K, # 57 Exhibit L, # 58 Exhibit M, # 59 Exhibit N, # 60 Exhibit O, # 61 Exhibit P, # 62 Exhibit Q, # 63 Exhibit R, # 64 Exhibit S, # 65 Exhibit T, # 66 Exhibit U, # 67 Exhibit V, # 68 Exhibit W, # 69 Exhibit X, # 70 Exhibit Y, # 71 Exhibit Z, # 72 Exhibit AA, # 73 Exhibit BB, # 74 Exhibit CC, # 75 Exhibit DD, # 76 Exhibit EE, # 77 Exhibit FF, # 78 Exhibit GG)(SEGAL, MATTHEW)
March 17, 2008 99
AFFIDAVIT of David Symonds re 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Cross-Claim of Defs. R. & M. Calcagni (Redacted), 96 MOTION for Summary Judgment on all Claims of Plaintiff S. Sandler & Incorp. Memo. of Law filed by BOOKSURGE LLC. (SEGAL, MATTHEW) Modified on 5/6/2008 to remove redacted from text(lrc).
April 18, 2007 9
Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, by BOOKSURGE LLC.Responses due by 5/9/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(WRIGHT, STEVEN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SANDLER v. CALCAGNI et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHANA SANDLER
Represented By: BERNARD J. KUBETZ
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RALPH CALCAGNI
Represented By: BRUCE C. MALLONEE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAUREEN CALCAGNI
Represented By: BRUCE C. MALLONEE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETERS MARS
Represented By: DANIEL I. BILLINGS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: PETERS MARS
Represented By: J. WILLIAM DRUARY, JR.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: MAUREEN CALCAGNI
Represented By: BRUCE C. MALLONEE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: RALPH CALCAGNI
Represented By: BRUCE C. MALLONEE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: PETERS MARS
Represented By: J. WILLIAM DRUARY, JR.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]