ALFANO v. USA

Respondent: USA
Petitioner: ROBERT ALFANO
Case Number: 1:2008cv00252
Filed: July 23, 2008
Court: Maine District Court
Office: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence Office
Referring Judge: MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK
Presiding Judge: JOHN A. WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 7, 2008 11 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) Re: 05-cr-91-B-W-001 filed by ROBERT ALFANO. Objections to R&R due by 10/27/2008. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK. (CWP)
December 12, 2008 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER affirming in part and rejecting in part 11 Report and Recommendations. Renewed Motion 7 for appointment of counsel by ALFANO is granted. Evidentiary hearing on motion to vacate to be scheduled after appointment of counsel. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (jgw)
January 15, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER affirming in part and rejecting in part 11 Report and Recommendations. This Amended Order corrects a clerical error contained in the Order on Recommended Decision (Docket # 14) dated 12/12/2008. Please see footnote 1 of this Amended Order for the correction. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
January 15, 2009 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (err)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALFANO v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: GAIL FISK MALONE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ROBERT ALFANO
Represented By: MICHAEL WHIPPLE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]