SCHOLEFIELD v. RIVERVIEW PHYCIATRIC CENTER

Plaintiff: ALAN RAYMOND SCHOLEFIELD
Defendant: DOCTOR CASTELLANOS and DOCTOR SENA
 
Case Number: 1:2008cv00391
Filed: November 17, 2008
 
Court: Maine District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition) Office
Referring Judge: MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK
Presiding Judge: JOHN A. WOODCOCK
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 10, 2009 28 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re 23 MOTION to Dismiss filed by DOCTOR CASTELLANOS. Objections to R&R due by 3/27/2009. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK. (CWP)
June 5, 2009 41 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re 27 MOTION to Dismiss filed by DOCTOR SENA. Objections to R&R due by 6/22/2009. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK. (CWP)
June 30, 2009 45 Featured Case ORDER granting 23 Motion to Dismiss; adopting 28 Report and Recommended Decision for 23 Motion to Dismiss, filed by DOCTOR CASTELLANOS. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
June 30, 2009 46 Featured Case ORDER granting 27 Motion to Dismiss; adopting 41 Report and Recommended Decision for 27 Motion to Dismiss filed by DOCTOR SENA. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
November 17, 2008 5 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK. (CWP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: SCHOLEFIELD v. RIVERVIEW PHYCIATRIC CENTER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALAN RAYMOND SCHOLEFIELD
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOCTOR CASTELLANOS
Represented By: THOMAS A. KNOWLTON
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOCTOR SENA
Represented By: ROBERT C. HATCH
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]