NATIONAL ORGANIZATION FOR MARRIAGE et al v. MCKEE et al

Amicus: MAINE CITIZENS FOR CLEAN ELECTIONS
Defendant: ATTORNEY GENERAL, STATE OF MAINE, NEAL T ADAMS, MICHAEL E POVICH, GEOFFREY RUSHLAU, R CHRISTOPHER ALMY, EVERT FOWLE, NORMAN CROTEAU, STEPHANIE ANDERSON, MARK LAWRENCE, EDWARD M YOUNGBLOOD, FRANCIS C MARSANO, MICHAEL P FRIEDMAN, ANDRE G DUCHETTE and WALTER F MCKEE
Plaintiff: AMERICAN PRINCIPLES IN ACTION and NATIONAL ORGANIZATION FOR MARRIAGE
 
Case Number: 1:2009cv00538
Filed: October 21, 2009
 
Court: Maine District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
Presiding Judge: D. BROCK HORNBY
Referring Judge: JOHN H. RICH
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 19, 2010 164 Featured Case BENCH TRIAL DECISION AND ORDER ON MOTION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF re 115 Third MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by NATIONAL ORGANIZATION FOR MARRIAGE and 160 Bench Trial completed. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (mnw)
August 31, 2010 189 Featured Case ORDER AFFIRMING THE RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE denying 167 Motion to Stay; adopting Report and Recommended Decision re 174 Report and Recommendations. By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (mnw)
January 26, 2011 217 Featured Case ORDER denying without prejudice 203 MOTION to Seal Exhibits to Defendants' Exhibits to Response to Third Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Exhibits to Defendants' Response/Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment; Sealed Portions of NOM Deposition; denying SEALED MOTION for Sealed Evidence not to be Considered on Summary Judgment By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (jgw)
February 18, 2011 218 Featured Case DECISION AND ORDER ON CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - denying 138 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 186 Motion for Summary Judgment. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (mnw)
October 28, 2009 22 Featured Case DECISION AND ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER denying 3 Motion for TRO. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (mnw)
January 11, 2013 276 Featured Case DECISION AND ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' BILL OF COSTS AND PLAINTIFFS' PETITION FOR FEES AND EXPENSES - granting 250 Bill of Costs; granting in part 253 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (mnw)
February 17, 2010 50 Featured Case ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS - overruling 43 Appeal from Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court; denying 44 Motion to Stay. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (mnw)
April 27, 2010 82 Featured Case ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STAY - denying 63 Motion to Stay - By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (mnw)
May 23, 2010 97 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER ON SECOND SET OF DISCOVERY DISPUTES By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (lrc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: NATIONAL ORGANIZATION FOR MARRIAGE et al v. MCKEE et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: MAINE CITIZENS FOR CLEAN ELECTIONS
Represented By: BENJAMIN K. GRANT
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATTORNEY GENERAL, STATE OF MAINE
Represented By: PHYLLIS GARDINER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEAL T ADAMS
Represented By: PHYLLIS GARDINER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL E POVICH
Represented By: PHYLLIS GARDINER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEOFFREY RUSHLAU
Represented By: PHYLLIS GARDINER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R CHRISTOPHER ALMY
Represented By: PHYLLIS GARDINER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVERT FOWLE
Represented By: PHYLLIS GARDINER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORMAN CROTEAU
Represented By: PHYLLIS GARDINER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHANIE ANDERSON
Represented By: PHYLLIS GARDINER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK LAWRENCE
Represented By: PHYLLIS GARDINER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWARD M YOUNGBLOOD
Represented By: PHYLLIS GARDINER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANCIS C MARSANO
Represented By: PHYLLIS GARDINER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL P FRIEDMAN
Represented By: PHYLLIS GARDINER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDRE G DUCHETTE
Represented By: PHYLLIS GARDINER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALTER F MCKEE
Represented By: PHYLLIS GARDINER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN PRINCIPLES IN ACTION
Represented By: JAMES BOPP, JR.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONAL ORGANIZATION FOR MARRIAGE
Represented By: JAMES BOPP, JR.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]