HINTON v. OUTBOARD MARINE CORPORATION et al

Defendant: OUTBOARD MARINE CORPORATION
Plaintiff: MICHAEL HINTON
 
Case Number: 1:2009cv00554
Filed: October 30, 2009
 
Court: Maine District Court
Office: Marine Product Liability Office
Referring Judge: MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK
Presiding Judge: JOHN A. WOODCOCK
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 19, 2012 159 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 125 Motion in Limine Objecting to Plaintiff's Proposed Deposition Designation. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
January 20, 2012 160 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 138 Motion in Limine on the Issue of Who is a Seller Under 14 M.R.S.A. Section 221 and Plaintiff's Unsupported Claim that the Defendants Were the Sellers of the Accident Boat. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
January 20, 2012 161 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing without prejudice 127 Request that the Court Take Judicial Notice of Applicable Regulations, Industry Standards and Documents. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
January 23, 2012 165 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on 142 Motion in Limine to Exclude Certain Evidence. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
January 24, 2012 168 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part and deferring in part 144 Motion in Limine Concerning Cross-Examination of Mr. Hinton and Other Fact Witnesses By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
January 24, 2012 169 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 147 Motion in Limine to Limit Medical Damages to Amount Paid by Plaintiff Which Plaintiff has the Burden of Proving. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
January 25, 2012 171 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 154 Motion to Exclude or Substantially Limit the Testimony of Robert MacNeill and Demonstrative Exhibits with that Testimony. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
January 27, 2012 172 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 143 Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Mere Comparative Negligence. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
January 30, 2012 175 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER granting in part and denying in part 143 Second Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Mere Comparative Negligence. This Amended Order corrects a typographical error in the Order dated 1/27/2012 (Docket #172). See footnote 1 of this Amended Order for the correction. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
June 13, 2012 189 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing as moot 188 Motion for Waiver. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
December 22, 2010 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 26 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
April 8, 2011 63 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT OF TELEPHONE CONFERENCE AND ORDER striking 50 Motion for Summary Judgment; striking 51 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 54 Motion to Strike ; granting 55 Motion to Strike ; mooting 54 Motion to Extend Time; mooting 55 Motion to Extend Time; granting in part 56 Motion for Order; granting in part 57 Motion for Order. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK. (CWP)
April 12, 2011 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting with prejudice 45 Motion to Dismiss Count III of Third Amended Complaint. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
November 21, 2011 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing without prejudice 48 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine to Exclude or Limit Testimony of Defendants' Expert Witnesses; dismissing without prejudice 52 Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Exper t, Robert Flynn; dismissing without prejudice 65 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; dismissing without prejudice 67 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on the Identity of the Manufacturer of the Accident Boat; and, granting 79 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendants' Statement of Additional Undisputed Facts. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: HINTON v. OUTBOARD MARINE CORPORATION et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OUTBOARD MARINE CORPORATION
Represented By: PHILLIP S. BIXBY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL HINTON
Represented By: JULIE D. FARR
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]