SAMAAN v. ST JOSEPH HOSPITAL et al

Plaintiff: ANTON K SAMAAN
Defendant: ST JOSEPH HOSPITAL and DAVID KAPLAN
Case Number: 1:2009cv00656
Filed: December 31, 2009
Court: Maine District Court
Office: Bangor Office
Referring Judge: MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK
0 Judge: JOHN A. WOODCOCK
Presiding Judge: JOHN A. WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 10, 2011 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 94 Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Order on Motions for Summary Judgment. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
February 10, 2011 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 62 Motion in Limine to Exclude a July 5, 2007 Letter from Elsayed Hussein, M.D. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
April 1, 2011 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 117 Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Maryann Walsh, M.D. and Elsayed Hussein, M.D.; granting 117 Motion for Reconsideration By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (jlg)
February 9, 2012 163 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 143 Bill of Costs By CLERK OF COURT, Christa K. Berry. (ckb)
February 18, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 9 Motion to Remand to State Court; denying 9 Motion for Order to Transfer. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
October 14, 2010 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 26 Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Ravi Tikoo, M.D. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
October 14, 2010 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 24 Defendant David Kaplan, M.D.'s Motion for Summary Judgment and denying 29 Defendant St. Joseph Hospital's Motion for Summary Judgment. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
October 14, 2010 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 43 Motion to Limit Defendants' Expert Witnesses; denying 48 Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
December 6, 2010 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Daubert hearing. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
December 21, 2010 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Daubert Hearing. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SAMAAN v. ST JOSEPH HOSPITAL et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTON K SAMAAN
Represented By: JOHN P. FLYNN, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ST JOSEPH HOSPITAL
Represented By: JAMES F. MARTEMUCCI
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID KAPLAN
Represented By: THOMAS V. LAPRADE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]