USA v. BAXTER

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: GLENN A. BAXTER
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv00435
Filed: October 25, 2010
 
Court: Maine District Court
Office: Bangor Office
County: Kennebec
Referring Judge: MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK
Presiding Judge: JOHN A. WOODCOCK
 
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 49:781
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 13, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Motion to Substitute Name of Filing Party. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK. (CWP)
May 23, 2011 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 Motion to Dismiss Amended Counterclaim. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
January 10, 2012 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 23 Motion for Summary Judgment. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
February 1, 2012 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 40 Motion for Partial Voluntary Dismissal; granting 40 Motion for Judgment; denying 45 Motion for Leave to Present the Record of Plaintiff's Dishonesty By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (jgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: USA v. BAXTER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: EVAN J. ROTH
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLENN A. BAXTER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]