PARSLEY v. USA

Plaintiff: JOSEPH PARSLEY
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 2:2008cv00088
Filed: March 18, 2008
Court: Maine District Court
Office: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence Office
Presiding Judge: D. BROCK HORNBY
Referring Judge: MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 13, 2008 20 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) Re: 05-86-P-H-09 filed by JOSEPH PARSLEY. Objections to R&R due by 12/1/2008. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK. (CWP)
December 18, 2008 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFFIRMING IN PART AND REMANDING IN PART THE RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE 20 Report and Recommendations; ORDER on Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (mjlt)
March 27, 2009 39 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) Re: 05-86-P-H-09 filed by JOSEPH PARSLEY. Objections to R&R due by 4/13/2009. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK. (CWP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PARSLEY v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH PARSLEY
Represented By: E. JAMES BURKE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: MICHAEL J. CONLEY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]