FAIRCHILD SEMICONDUCTOR CORPORATION v. THIRD DIMENSION (3D) SEMICONDUCTOR INC

Consol_plaintiff: THIRD DIMENSION SEMICONDUCTOR INC
Counter_defendant: FAIRCHILD SEMICONDUCTOR CORPORATION
Counter_claimant: THIRD DIMENSION (3D) SEMICONDUCTOR INC
Defendant: THIRD DIMENSION (3D) SEMICONDUCTOR INC
Consol_defendant: FAIRCHILD SEMICONDUCTOR INTERNATIONAL INC
Plaintiff: FAIRCHILD SEMICONDUCTOR CORPORATION
 
Case Number: 2:2008cv00158
Filed: May 17, 2008
 
Court: Maine District Court
Office: Patent Office
Presiding Judge: D. BROCK HORNBY
Referring Judge: JOHN H. RICH
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 25, 2008 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS 89 Motion for Attorney Fees By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (mjlt)
December 10, 2008 146 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ORDER ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS - denying 47 Motion to Dismiss; denying 47 Motion for Abstention ; granting 54 Motion to Dismiss. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (mnw)
December 19, 2008 154 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL AND FOR SANCTIONS re 144 (Document sealed from public view) SEALED MOTION to Compel Continuation of Dr. Lee's Deposition(Document sealed from public view) SEALED MOTION for Sanctions(Document sealed from public view) filed by THIRD DIMENSION (3D) SEMICONDUCTOR INC By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (mjlt)
January 14, 2009 166 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Decision and Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction re Motion #21 for Preliminary Injunction and Motion #124 to Strike #124. (lnd) Modified docket text on 1/22/2009 to delete reference that this is a sealed document; document unsealed to make it publicly available. (lnd) Modified docket text on 1/27/2009 to add the document numbers which concerns this order. (lnd)
April 30, 2009 296 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR REDACTIONS OF DECISION By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (mjlt)
April 30, 2009 297 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS FOR SANCTIONS AND TO STRIKE AND DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS FOR ATTORNEY FEES, TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER, AND FOR RULE 56 (F) CONTINUANCE re: 252 Motion to Continue; 210 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order; 194 Motion for Sanctions By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (mjlt)
October 19, 2008 84 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT OF HEARING AND ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (mjlt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: FAIRCHILD SEMICONDUCTOR CORPORATION v. THIRD DIMENSION (3D) SEMICONDUCTOR INC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_plaintiff: THIRD DIMENSION SEMICONDUCTOR INC
Represented By: JEFFREY RAY BRAGALONE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: FAIRCHILD SEMICONDUCTOR CORPORATION
Represented By: STEPHEN H. GALEBACH
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: THIRD DIMENSION (3D) SEMICONDUCTOR INC
Represented By: JEFFREY RAY BRAGALONE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THIRD DIMENSION (3D) SEMICONDUCTOR INC
Represented By: JEFFREY RAY BRAGALONE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: FAIRCHILD SEMICONDUCTOR INTERNATIONAL INC
Represented By: ROBERT H. STIER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FAIRCHILD SEMICONDUCTOR CORPORATION
Represented By: STEPHEN H. GALEBACH
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]