SPOONER v. BOYNE USA INC et al

Plaintiff: JASON SPOONER
Defendant: DAN EGAN and EEN INC
Case Number: 2:2008cv00262
Filed: August 8, 2008
Court: Maine District Court
Office: Copyright Office
Referring Judge: JOHN H. RICH
Presiding Judge: GEORGE Z. SINGAL
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 17:101 Copyright Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 12, 2010 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOLLOWING BENCH TRIAL. Set Deadlines: Memoranda of Law due by 2/10/2010. By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (nrg)
May 11, 2010 119 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT & CONCLUSIONS OF LAW By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (mjlt)
October 28, 2010 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON AMENDED MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES granting in part 124 Motion for Attorney Fees By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
June 15, 2011 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON COSTS & ATTORNEYS FEES By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
June 5, 2009 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 51 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
July 21, 2009 69 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re 55 MOTION for Default Judgment as to EEN INC AND DAN EGAN filed by JASON SPOONER, 54 Motion for Sanctions filed by JASON SPOONER Objections to R&R due by 8/7/2009 By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (lrc) Modified on 7/27/2009 to reflect that the Recommended Decision referred to Motion #54(cef).
August 19, 2009 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFFIRMING THE RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 69 Report and Recommendations; Granting in part 54 Motion for Sanctions; Denying 55 Motion for Default Judgment. By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
October 13, 2009 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY FEES granting 55 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 55 Motion for Costs; denying 75 Motion to Stay By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (kic)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SPOONER v. BOYNE USA INC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON SPOONER
Represented By: KATHRYN K. ROWEN
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAN EGAN
Represented By: ROBERT E. MITTEL
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EEN INC
Represented By: ROBERT E. MITTEL
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]