MYFREEMEDICINE.COM LLC et al v. ALPINE INVESTORS LP et al

Plaintiff: MYFREEMEDICINE.COM LLC and GEOFFREY J HASLER
Defendant: ALPINE INVESTORS LP, JAMES N DEWOLFE, FRANK G DEWOLFE, SCOTT MACCHEYNE, GRAHAM WEAVER, WILLIAM T MAGUY, WILLIAM M ADAMS, BRIAN G FLAHERTY and JEFFREY STANEK
 
Case Number: 2:2008cv00362
Filed: October 23, 2008
 
Court: Maine District Court
Office: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization Office
Referring Judge: JOHN H. RICH
Presiding Judge: JOHN A. WOODCOCK
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 13, 2010 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 100 Report and Recommendation Decision for 89 Motion to Dismiss filed by WILLIAM M ADAMS, BRIAN G FLAHERTY, SCOTT MACCHEYNE, GRAHAM WEAVER, WILLIAM T MAGUY, ALPINE INVESTORS LP, 90 Motion to Dismiss filed by FRANK G DEWOLFE, JAMES N DEWOLFE, and 91 Motion to Dismiss filed by JEFFREY STANEK; Granting in part and denying in part 89 Motion to Dismiss; granting 90 Motion to Dismiss; granting 91 Motion to Dismiss. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
October 31, 2010 113 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re 110 MOTION to Stay MOTION to Compel filed by WILLIAM M ADAMS, GRAHAM WEAVER, WILLIAM T MAGUY, ALPINE INVESTORS LP Objections to R&R due by 11/17/2010 By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (jlg)
November 23, 2010 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER affirming Report and Recommended Decision re 113 Report and Recommendations; denying 110 Motion to Stay; denying 110 Motion to Compel Arbitration; By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (jgw)
April 14, 2009 59 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re 36 MOTION to Dismiss filed by JEFFREY STANEK, 29 MOTION to Dismiss and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by FRANK G DEWOLFE, JAMES N DEWOLFE, 35 MOTION to Dismiss filed by WILLIAM M ADAMS, BRIAN G FLAHERTY, SCOTT MACCHEYNE, GRAHAM WEAVER, WILLIAM T MAGUY, ALPINE INVESTORS LP Objections to R&R due by 5/1/2009 By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (mjlt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: MYFREEMEDICINE.COM LLC et al v. ALPINE INVESTORS LP et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MYFREEMEDICINE.COM LLC
Represented By: MICHAEL S. MALLOY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEOFFREY J HASLER
Represented By: MICHAEL S. MALLOY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALPINE INVESTORS LP
Represented By: EBEN ALBERT-KNOPP
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES N DEWOLFE
Represented By: NICOLE L. BRADICK
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANK G DEWOLFE
Represented By: NICOLE L. BRADICK
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT MACCHEYNE
Represented By: EBEN ALBERT-KNOPP
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRAHAM WEAVER
Represented By: EBEN ALBERT-KNOPP
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM T MAGUY
Represented By: EBEN ALBERT-KNOPP
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM M ADAMS
Represented By: EBEN ALBERT-KNOPP
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN G FLAHERTY
Represented By: EBEN ALBERT-KNOPP
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY STANEK
Represented By: NEAL F. PRATT
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]