YAZDANI et al v. DANLY INC et al

Defendant: LISA TRIPLER, DANLY INC and DANIEL RAPAPORT
Plaintiff: NICHOLAS YAZDANI, BABAK YAZDANI, LISA YAZDANI and MICHAEL YAZDANI
 
Case Number: 2:2009cv00108
Filed: March 25, 2009
 
Court: Maine District Court
Office: P.I.: Other Office
Presiding Judge: D. BROCK HORNBY
Referring Judge: JOHN H. RICH
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 4, 2010 151 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER ON DISCOVERY DISPUTE By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (nrg)
November 3, 2010 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 162 Motion to Quash; granting in part 162 Motion for Protective Order By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (cef)
November 17, 2010 177 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER ON MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING - granting 165 Motion to Continue. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (mnw)
March 1, 2011 204 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT OF MINORS' CLAIMS - granting 196 Motion for Approval of Settlement. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (mnw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: YAZDANI et al v. DANLY INC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LISA TRIPLER
Represented By: ROGER F. BRUNELLE, JR.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANLY INC
Represented By: ROGER F. BRUNELLE, JR.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL RAPAPORT
Represented By: ROGER F. BRUNELLE, JR.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICHOLAS YAZDANI
Represented By: C. ALLEN FOSTER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BABAK YAZDANI
Represented By: C. ALLEN FOSTER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISA YAZDANI
Represented By: C. ALLEN FOSTER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL YAZDANI
Represented By: C. ALLEN FOSTER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]