HD MICHIGAN LLC et al v. HANNON

Plaintiff: HARLEY DAVIDSON MOTOR COMPANY GROUP LLC and HD MICHIGAN LLC
Case Number: 2:2009cv00378
Filed: August 19, 2009
Court: Maine District Court
Office: Trademark Office
Referring Judge: JOHN H. RICH
Presiding Judge: GEORGE Z. SINGAL
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 25, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES denying 15 Motion for Attorney Fees By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (nrg)
March 7, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court RECOMMENDED DECISION on 17 SUPPLEMENTAL APPLICATION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEY FEES filed by HARLEY DAVIDSON MOTOR COMPANY GROUP LLC, HD MICHIGAN LLC Objections to R&R due by 3/24/2010 By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (lrc)
March 25, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFFIRMING THE RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 18 Report and Recommendations; granting 17 Supplemental Motion for Attorney Fees By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HD MICHIGAN LLC et al v. HANNON
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HARLEY DAVIDSON MOTOR COMPANY GROUP LLC
Represented By: JONATHAN M. GELCHINSKY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HD MICHIGAN LLC
Represented By: JONATHAN M. GELCHINSKY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]