EDWARDS, et al. v, EASTMAN, et al.

Plaintiff: ERNEST EDWARDS and KARLA EDWARDS
Defendant: ROBERT EASTMAN, II, ROBERT EASTMAN, III, ERIK EASTMAN and EASTMAN OUTDOORS, INCORPORATED
Debtor: GAME TRACKER, INCORPORATED
Case Number: 2:2010cv00189
Filed: May 17, 2010
Court: Maine District Court
Office: Portland Office
County: XX Outside the State
Presiding Judge: D. BROCK HORNBY
Nature of Suit: Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 27, 2010 42 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ORDER ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT - denying 30 Motion to Set Aside Default. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (mnw)
July 28, 2011 56 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER ON MOTION IN LIMINE- ORDER granting docket no. 52 By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (cef)
September 8, 2011 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFFIRMING MEMORANDUM DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 59 Appeal from Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (mnw)
October 24, 2011 68 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ORDER ON MOTION TO STRIKE JURY DEMAND - granting 60 Motion to Strike 57 Jury Demand. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (mnw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EDWARDS, et al. v, EASTMAN, et al.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERNEST EDWARDS
Represented By: VERNE E. PARADIE, JR.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KARLA EDWARDS
Represented By: VERNE E. PARADIE, JR.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT EASTMAN, II
Represented By: BISHOP A.L.E. BARTONI
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT EASTMAN, III
Represented By: BISHOP A.L.E. BARTONI
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIK EASTMAN
Represented By: BISHOP A.L.E. BARTONI
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EASTMAN OUTDOORS, INCORPORATED
Represented By: BISHOP A.L.E. BARTONI
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: GAME TRACKER, INCORPORATED
Represented By: DONALD C. DARNELL
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]